Fifth Court of Appeals

Case: 05-16-01026-CV    
05-16-01026-CV
08/29/2016
Miscellaneous/other civil
In Re Estate of Gary Wayne Luna 
 
No 
 
 
 
 
 
West Publishing 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
02/01/2018Brief filed - oral argument requestedAppellee
01/02/2018Brief filed - oral argument requestedAppellant
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
11/15/2018Memorandum opinion issuedAffirmed
11/15/2018Order enteredMotion or Writ Denied
11/15/2018Retention time case file will be retainedDestroy
10/16/2018Submitted 
10/12/2018Confirmation of oral argument & counsel presenting oral argument 
10/11/2018Confirmation of oral argument & counsel presenting oral argument 
09/05/2018Set for submission on oral argument 
05/08/2018Letter issued by the court 
04/25/2018Motion filed 
02/01/2018Case ready to be set 
02/01/2018Brief filed - oral argument requested 
02/01/2018Appellees brief due 
01/03/2018Appellants brief due 
01/02/2018Brief filed - oral argument requested 
12/04/2017Order enteredOtherwise Disposed
12/01/2017Response due 
11/29/2017Response filed 
11/21/2017Electronic Supplemental Clerks Record Filed 
11/10/2017Electronic Supplemental Reporter/Recorders Record Filed 
11/09/2017Order enteredOtherwise Disposed
10/26/2017Reporters record due 
10/26/2017Clerks record due 
10/19/2017Electronic Clerks Record Filed 
10/18/2017Order enteredOtherwise Disposed
09/27/2017Appellants brief due 
08/28/2017Clerks record due 
08/28/2017Reporters record due 
08/27/2017Appellants brief due 
08/17/2017Order enteredOtherwise Disposed
08/17/2017Reporters record filed 
07/31/2017Reporters record due 
07/31/2017Clerks record due 
07/28/2017Electronic Reporter/Recorders Record FiledStrike
07/17/2017Electronic Clerks Record FiledStrike
06/30/2017Order enteredOtherwise Disposed
06/30/2017Case reinstated 
11/01/2016Order issuedConsolidated/Voids
10/11/2016No clerks record filed in civil case 
10/11/2016No reporters record filed in civil case 
10/09/2016Record due 
09/01/2016Docketing statement filed 
08/29/2016Docketing statement due 
08/29/2016Fee paid 
08/29/2016Notice of appeal filed in trial court 
08/29/2016Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals 
08/10/2016Judgment signed by trial court judge 
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
01/25/2019StatusMandate to Issue
11/15/2024RetentionDate civil case will be destroyed (6 yrs after mandate)
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Luna, Alison AppellantGregory W. Mitchell  
Wright, TaylorAppelleeSarah Russell
Luna, CameronAppelleeKevin Davidson
Bennett, J EllenAppelleeJames Brian Thomas  
J. Ellen Bennett
Trial Court Information
Probate Court No. 1 
Dallas 
Honorable Brenda Hull Thompson 
PR-15-02365-1 
Jacqueline A. Galindo 
 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site