Fifth Court of Appeals

Case: 05-15-01559-CV    
05-15-01559-CV
12/31/2015
Governmental Immunity
Dawn Nettles 
GTECH Corporation 
No 
 
 
 
 
 
West Publishing 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
01/25/2017Post submission brief filedAppellee
01/18/2017Post submission brief filedAppellant
01/10/2017Appendix filedAppellant
12/20/2016Additional authorities filedAppellee
09/15/2016Reply brief filedAppellant
07/14/2016Brief filed - oral argument requestedAppellee
05/18/2016Brief filed - oral argument requestedAppellant
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
02/15/2018Petition for review filed in Supreme Court 
02/06/2018Motion for extension of time to file petition for review disposed by Supreme CourtMotion or Writ Granted
12/11/2017Motion for extension of time to file petition for review filed in Supreme Court 
12/11/2017Motion for extension of time to file petition for review disposed by Supreme CourtMotion or Writ Granted
12/07/2017Sent to publisher 
11/01/2017Motion for en banc reconsideration disposedMotion or Writ Denied
10/10/2017Letter filed 
10/06/2017Motion for rehearing en banc filed 
10/06/2017Motion for rehearing due 
09/08/2017Motion for extension of time to file motion for rehearing disposedMotion or Writ Granted
09/06/2017Motion for extension of time to file motion for rehearing filed 
09/06/2017Motion for rehearing due 
08/07/2017Motion for extension of time to file motion for rehearing disposedMotion or Writ Granted
08/04/2017Motion for extension of time to file motion for rehearing filed 
07/21/2017Memorandum opinion issuedAffirmed
07/21/2017Retention time case file will be retainedDestroy
01/25/2017Post submission brief filed 
01/18/2017Post submission brief filed 
01/11/2017Submitted 
01/10/2017Appendix filed 
01/05/2017Confirmation of oral argument & counsel presenting oral argument 
01/04/2017Confirmation of oral argument & counsel presenting oral argument 
12/20/2016Additional authorities filed 
11/07/2016Set for submission on oral argument 
09/16/2016Reply brief due 
09/15/2016Reply brief filed 
09/07/2016Order enteredMotion or Writ Granted
09/02/2016Motion for extension of time to file reply brief filed 
09/02/2016Reply brief due 
07/21/2016Order enteredMotion or Writ Granted
07/19/2016Motion for extension of time to file reply brief filed 
07/14/2016Case ready to be set 
07/14/2016Brief filed - oral argument requested 
07/14/2016Appellees brief due 
06/23/2016Appellees brief due 
06/16/2016Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
06/16/2016Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
06/15/2016Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
05/23/2016Order enteredMotion or Writ Granted
05/19/2016Motion to dismiss filed 
05/18/2016Brief filed - oral argument requested 
05/18/2016Appellants brief due 
05/13/2016Order enteredMotion or Writ Granted
05/11/2016Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
05/11/2016Appellants brief due 
04/20/2016Letter filed 
04/14/2016Order enteredMotion or Writ Granted
04/10/2016Appellants brief due 
04/08/2016Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
04/06/2016Letter filed 
04/05/2016Letter received 
04/05/2016Supplemental reporters record due 
03/31/2016Notice filed 
03/30/2016Electronic Reporter/Recorders Record Filed 
03/29/2016Order enteredOtherwise Disposed
03/21/2016Supplemental reporters record due 
03/14/2016Order enteredMotion or Writ Granted
03/11/2016Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
03/11/2016Appellants brief due 
03/10/2016Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
03/01/2016Motion to supplement record filed 
02/25/2016Letter filed 
02/24/2016Notice filed 
02/13/2016Record due 
02/12/2016Letter filed 
02/10/2016Electronic Clerks Record Filed 
01/04/2016Fee paid 
01/04/2016Additional copies of documents received after initial filing 
01/04/2016Docketing statement filed 
12/31/2015Docketing statement due 
12/31/2015Fee requested 
12/31/2015Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals 
12/30/2015Notice of appeal filed in trial court 
12/15/2015Judgment signed by trial court judge 
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
02/15/2018Appeal to Higher CourtHigher court review
07/21/2023RetentionDate civil case will be destroyed (6 yrs after mandate)
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Texas Lottery CommissionAppellee 
GTECH CorporationAppelleeKent G. Rutter  
Michael Bernick
Kenneth E. Broughton Jr.
Francisco Rivero
Arturo Munoz
Nina Cortell
Nettles, DawnAppellantManfred Sternberg Jr.
Mary Ellis LaGarde
Thad D. Spalding  
Peter M. Kelly  
Richard L. LaGarde
Trial Court Information
160th Judicial District Court 
Dallas 
Honorable Jim Jordan 
DC-14-14838 
Sharron Rankin 
 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site