Fifth Court of Appeals

Case: 05-14-01491-CV    
05-14-01491-CV
11/24/2014
Insurance
Richardson East Baptist Church 
Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company and James Greenhaw 
No 
 
 
 
 
 
West Publishing 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
03/21/2016Post submission brief filedAppellee
07/28/2015Reply brief filedAppellant
07/17/2015Reply brief receivedAppellant
07/15/2015Reply brief filedAppellant
07/15/2015Reply brief filedAppellant
06/12/2015Brief filed - oral argument requestedAppellee
06/09/2015Brief filed - oral argument requestedAppellee
04/16/2015Brief filed - oral argument requestedAppellant
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
01/10/2018Mandate issued 
09/22/2017Petition for review disposed by Supreme CourtMotion or Writ Denied
01/23/2017Case forwarded to higher court 
07/18/2016Motion for extension of time to file petition for review disposed by Supreme CourtMotion or Writ Granted
07/18/2016Motion for extension of time to file petition for review filed in Supreme Court 
07/16/2016Petition for review filed in Supreme Court 
06/29/2016Motion for extension of time to file petition for review disposed by Supreme CourtMotion or Writ Granted
05/16/2016Motion for extension of time to file petition for review disposed by Supreme CourtMotion or Writ Granted
05/13/2016Sent to publisher 
05/12/2016Motion for extension of time to file petition for review filed in Supreme Court 
03/30/2016Memorandum opinion issuedAffirmed
03/30/2016Retention time case file will be retainedDestroy
03/21/2016Post submission brief filed 
03/21/2016Corrected brief requested 
02/17/2016Submitted 
02/15/2016Confirmation of oral argument & counsel presenting oral argument 
02/08/2016Confirmation of oral argument & counsel presenting oral argument 
12/21/2015Set for submission on oral argument 
11/16/2015Motion to reset oral argument disposedMotion or Writ Granted
11/11/2015Motion to reset oral argument filed 
11/10/2015Corrected entry made by clerks office 
11/05/2015Document filed 
11/05/2015Confirmation of oral argument & counsel presenting oral argument 
11/03/2015Set for submission on oral argument 
07/28/2015Reply brief filed 
07/28/2015Order enteredMotion or Writ Granted
07/17/2015Reply brief received 
07/17/2015Motion to file amended brief filed 
07/15/2015Reply brief filed 
07/15/2015Reply brief filed 
07/15/2015Reply brief due 
06/30/2015Order enteredMotion or Writ Granted
06/29/2015Motion for extension of time to file reply brief filed 
06/12/2015Brief filed - oral argument requested 
06/12/2015Appellees brief due 
06/09/2015Case ready to be set 
06/09/2015Brief filed - oral argument requested 
05/16/2015Appellees brief due 
05/08/2015Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
05/07/2015Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
04/16/2015Brief filed - oral argument requested 
04/16/2015Appellants brief due 
04/03/2015Electronic Supplemental Clerks Record Filed 
04/01/2015Order enteredMotion or Writ Granted
03/31/2015Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
03/31/2015Appellants brief due 
03/03/2015Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
03/02/2015Notice filed 
03/02/2015Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
03/02/2015Corrected document requested 
03/01/2015Appellants brief due 
02/03/2015Letter received 
01/30/2015Electronic Clerks Record Filed 
01/27/2015No clerks record filed in civil case 
01/24/2015Clerks record due 
11/25/2014Letter received 
11/24/2014Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals 
11/21/2014Notice of appeal filed in trial court 
11/21/2014Docketing statement filed 
10/23/2014Motion for new trial was filed in the trial court 
09/26/2014Judgment signed by trial court judge 
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
01/10/2018Case StoredCase stored
03/30/2022RetentionDate civil case will be destroyed (6 yrs after mandate)
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance CompanyAppelleeKelli Gunter
Richard Landon Hathaway
William Robert Pilat
Richardson East Baptist ChurchAppellantKirk L. Pittard  
Shannon Elizabeth Loyd
Frederick Leighton Durham
Leigh Prichard Bradford
Thad D. Spalding  
Greenhaw, JamesAppelleeBruce Wilkin  
Jay W. Brown  
Andrew Edelman
Trial Court Information
298th Judicial District Court 
Dallas 
Honorable Emily G. Tobolowsky 
DC-13-13868 
Marcey J. Poeckes 
 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site