Fifth Court of Appeals

Case: 05-14-01383-CV    
05-14-01383-CV
10/27/2014
Corporations & partnerships
Enterprise Products Partners, L.P. and Enterprise Products Operating LLC 
Energy Transfer Partners, L.P. and Energy Transfer Fuel, L.P. 
No 
 
 
 
 
 
West Publishing 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
08/29/2016Additional authorities filedAppellee
06/03/2016Post submission brief filedAppellee
05/27/2016Post submission brief filedAppellant
05/10/2016Post submission brief filedAppellee
04/18/2016Amicus curiae brief received 
03/17/2016Amicus curiae brief received 
01/28/2016Brief received - oral argument not requestedAmicus Curiae
09/18/2015Reply brief filedAppellant
06/29/2015Brief filed - oral argument requestedAppellee
03/30/2015Brief filed - oral argument requestedAppellant
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
10/25/2017Sent to publisher 
10/19/2017Motion for extension of time to file petition for review disposed by Supreme CourtMotion or Writ Granted
10/19/2017Motion for extension of time to file petition for review filed in Supreme Court 
09/13/2017Motion for rehearing deniedMotion or Writ Denied
09/07/2017Letter filed 
09/01/2017Motion for rehearing due 
08/31/2017Motion for rehearing filed 
08/02/2017Letter filed 
08/01/2017Motion for extension of time to file motion for rehearing disposedMotion or Writ Granted
07/28/2017Motion for extension of time to file motion for rehearing filed 
07/18/2017Opinion issuedReversed & Rendered
07/18/2017Retention time case file will be retainedDestroy
11/21/2016Notice filed 
08/29/2016Additional authorities filed 
06/03/2016Post submission brief filed 
05/27/2016Post submission brief filed 
05/10/2016Post submission brief filed 
04/20/2016Submitted 
04/19/2016Oral argument exhibits filed 
04/19/2016Oral argument exhibits filed 
04/18/2016Amicus curiae brief received 
04/14/2016Confirmation of oral argument & counsel presenting oral argument 
04/12/2016Confirmation of oral argument & counsel presenting oral argument 
03/17/2016Amicus curiae brief received 
03/02/2016Set for submission on oral argument 
01/29/2016Motion to reset oral argument disposedMotion or Writ Granted
01/29/2016Response filed 
01/28/2016Motion to reset oral argument filed 
01/28/2016Brief received - oral argument not requested 
01/14/2016Letter filed 
01/14/2016Set for submission on oral argument 
11/02/2015Letter filed 
09/18/2015Reply brief filed 
09/18/2015Reply brief due 
08/19/2015Reply brief due 
08/10/2015Order enteredMotion or Writ Granted
08/05/2015Motion for extension of time to file reply brief filed 
07/19/2015Reply brief due 
07/13/2015Order enteredMotion or Writ Granted
07/09/2015Motion for extension of time to file reply brief filed 
06/29/2015Electronic Supplemental Clerks Record Filed 
06/29/2015Brief filed - oral argument requested 
06/29/2015Appellees brief due 
05/29/2015Appellees brief due 
05/15/2015Order enteredMotion or Writ Granted
05/13/2015Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
04/29/2015Appellees brief due 
04/27/2015Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
04/21/2015Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
03/30/2015Brief filed - oral argument requested 
03/30/2015Appellants brief due 
02/28/2015Appellants brief due 
02/20/2015Order enteredMotion or Writ Granted
02/17/2015Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
01/29/2015Appellants brief due 
01/21/2015Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
01/19/2015Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
01/09/2015Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals 
01/09/2015Docketing statement filed 
12/30/2014Electronic Reporter/Recorders Record Filed 
12/18/2014Electronic Clerks Record Filed 
12/01/2014No clerks record filed in civil case 
12/01/2014No reporters record filed in civil case 
11/26/2014Record due 
10/28/2014Docketing statement filed 
10/28/2014Docketing statement due 
10/27/2014Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals 
10/24/2014Notice of appeal filed in trial court 
08/27/2014Motion for new trial was filed in the trial court 
07/29/2014Judgment signed by trial court judge 
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
07/18/2023RetentionDate civil case will be destroyed (6 yrs after mandate)
11/27/2017Appeal to Higher CourtPetition for review due in Supreme Court
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Enterprise Products Partners, et alAppellantMarianne Marsh Auld  
Russell Stanley Post  
Wallace B. Jefferson
Shawn Long  
Rachel Anne Ekery
David Beck
Jeffrey M. Golub
Richard A. Sayles  
David M. Gunn
David E. Keltner
P. Michael Jung
Enterprise Transfer Partners, L.P., et alAppelleeJeremy A. Fielding
Michael P. Lynn
Christopher John Akin
Melissa A. Lorber  
Samuel Hardy IV
David S. Coale  
Craig T. Enoch
Nina Cortell
Jeremy D. Kernodle
Kelli Bills  
Trial Court Information
298th Judicial District Court 
Dallas 
Honorable Emily G. Tobolowsky 
11-12667 
David Roy 
 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site