Fifth Court of Appeals

Case: 05-13-01428-CV    
05-13-01428-CV
10/18/2013
Contract
Crawford Services, Inc. 
Skillman International Firm, L.L.C. 
No 
 
 
 
 
 
West Publishing 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
04/17/2014Amicus curiae brief received 
03/20/2014Amicus curiae brief received 
02/19/2014Reply brief filedAppellant
01/30/2014Brief filed - oral argument not requestedAppellee
01/13/2014Brief filed - oral argument requestedAppellant
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
05/04/2015Mandate issued 
04/27/2015Order entered 
03/13/2015Petition for review disposed by Supreme CourtDismissed
11/07/2014Motion for extension of time to file petition for review disposed by Supreme CourtMotion or Writ Granted
11/07/2014Motion for extension of time to file petition for review filed in Supreme Court 
11/07/2014Petition for review filed in Supreme Court 
09/29/2014Sent to publisher 
09/22/2014Motion for en banc reconsideration disposedMotion or Writ Denied
08/27/2014Motion for en banc reconsideration filed 
08/22/2014Opinion issuedReversed & Rendered
08/22/2014Retention time case file will be retainedDestroy
06/11/2014Submitted 
04/17/2014Amicus curiae brief received 
03/20/2014Amicus curiae brief received 
03/18/2014Set for submission on briefs 
02/19/2014Reply brief filed 
02/19/2014Corrected brief requested 
02/12/2014Appellees brief due 
02/03/2014Order enteredMotion or Writ Granted
01/30/2014Case ready to be set 
01/30/2014Brief filed - oral argument not requested 
01/29/2014Motion to dismiss filed 
01/21/2014Electronic Supplemental Clerks Record Filed 
01/20/2014Record due 
01/13/2014Brief filed - oral argument requested 
01/12/2014Appellants brief due 
12/24/2013Docketing statement filed 
12/13/2013Fee requested 
12/13/2013Docketing statement due 
12/13/2013Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals 
12/13/2013Appellants brief due 
12/12/2013Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
12/11/2013Notice of appeal filed in trial court 
12/11/2013Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
11/13/2013Reporters record filed 
11/06/2013No reporters record filed in civil case 
10/30/2013Electronic Clerks Record Filed 
10/18/2013Docketing statement filed 
10/18/2013Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals 
10/17/2013Notice of appeal filed in trial court 
09/30/2013Request for findings of fact and conclusions of law 
09/22/2013Judgment signed by trial court judge 
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
05/04/2015Case StoredCase stored
08/22/2020RetentionDate civil case will be destroyed (6 yrs after mandate)
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Crawford Services, Inc.AppellantStephen M. Hines
Skillman International Firm, L.L.C.AppelleeJohn F. Redwine
J. Michael Weston
Trial Court Information
95th Judicial District Court 
Dallas 
Honorable Ken Molberg 
12-3217 
Deana K. Rouse 
 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site