Case: 04-18-00309-CV    
04-18-00309-CV
05/08/2018
Election contest/appeal - Regular appeal
Leticia Garza Galvan and Martie Garcia Vela  
Eloy Vera and Baldermar Garza  
No 
 
 
 
 
 
West Publishing 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
08/21/2018Reply brief filedAppellant
08/01/2018Brief filed - oral argument requestedAppellee
07/05/2018Brief filed - oral argument not requestedAppellant
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
11/07/2018Mandate issued 
08/29/2018Memorandum opinion issuedAffirmed
08/29/2018Submitted 
08/27/2018Response filed 
08/27/2018Order entered 
08/27/2018Motion to dismiss disposedMotion or Writ Denied
08/23/2018Motion to dismiss filed 
08/21/2018Reply brief filed 
08/20/2018Order entered 
08/20/2018Motion disposedGrant motion
08/20/2018Motion disposedGrant motion
08/20/2018Order entered 
08/20/2018Motion disposedMotion Granted in Part
08/17/2018Reply to response or motion filed 
08/17/2018Motion filed 
08/16/2018Response filed 
08/16/2018Motion filed 
08/07/2018Letter filed 
08/07/2018Set for submission on oral argument 
08/07/2018Order entered 
08/06/2018Motion filed 
08/03/2018Case ready to be set 
08/01/2018Brief filed - oral argument requested 
07/25/2018Motion filed 
07/20/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedGrant motion
07/20/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
07/16/2018Supplemental reporters record filed 
07/10/2018Reporters record filed 
07/06/2018Internal memo 
07/05/2018Brief filed - oral argument not requested 
06/20/2018Reporters record filed 
06/18/2018Appearance of counsel 
06/15/2018Order entered 
06/15/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedGrant motion
06/15/2018Order entered 
06/15/2018Motion disposed 
06/12/2018Reporters record filed 
06/06/2018Letter filed 
06/05/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
06/01/2018Motion filed 
05/25/2018Letter filed 
05/21/2018Docketing statement filed 
05/17/2018Reporters record filed 
05/14/2018Clerks record filed 
05/08/2018Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals 
05/08/2018Case began in court of appeals 
05/07/2018Notice of appeal filed in trial court 
05/02/2018Request for findings of fact and conclusions of law 
05/02/2018Judgment signed by trial court judge 
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
11/07/2018Case StoredCase stored
11/07/2024RetentionDate civil case will be destroyed (6 yrs after mandate)
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Vera, EloyAppelleeJames F. McKibben Jr.
Carlos Omar Escobar
Vela, Martie GarciaAppellantJerad Najvar
Galvan, Leticia GarzaAppellantJerad Najvar
Garza, BaldemarAppelleeJames F. McKibben Jr.
Carlos Omar Escobar
Trial Court Information
229th Judicial District Court 
Starr 
Honorable Joel B. Johnson 
DC-18-186 
Ramiro Hernandez 
 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site