Fourth Court of Appeals

Case: 04-16-00821-CR    
04-16-00821-CR
12/21/2016
Disorderly Conduct
The State of Texas 
Dai'Vonte E'Shaun Titus Ross 
No 
 
 
 
 
 
West Publishing 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
04/03/2017Brief filed - oral argument requestedAppellee
02/13/2017Brief filed - oral argument not requestedState
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
01/24/2018Petition for discretionary review disposed by Court of Criminal AppealsGrant motion
10/30/2017Case forwarded to higher court 
10/25/2017Petition for discretionary review filed in Court of Criminal Appeals 
09/28/2017Motion for extension of time to file petition for discretionary review disposed by Court of Criminal AppealsGrant motion
09/19/2017Letter filed 
09/18/2017Certification of Compliance that opinion sent to criminal defendant 
09/01/2017Order entered 
09/01/2017Motion for rehearing deniedMotion or Writ Denied
08/18/2017Letter filed 
08/17/2017Motion for rehearing filed 
08/09/2017Appearance of counsel 
08/02/2017Opinion issuedAffirmed
06/13/2017Submitted 
05/02/2017Set for submission on briefs - oral argument denied 
04/05/2017Case ready to be set 
04/03/2017Brief filed - oral argument requested 
03/24/2017Order entered 
02/13/2017Brief filed - oral argument not requested 
02/09/2017Prescreened 
02/03/2017Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedGrant motion
02/02/2017Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
01/03/2017Reporters record filed 
12/28/2016Docketing statement filed 
12/22/2016Clerks record filed 
12/22/2016Letter filed 
12/22/2016Telephone inquiry to or from the court 
12/20/2016Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals 
12/20/2016Case began in court of appeals 
12/14/2016Notice of appeal filed in trial court 
12/02/2016Sentence imposed in the trial court 
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
10/25/2017Appeal to Higher CourtHigher court review
12/20/2016StatusPending action of court
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
The State of TexasCriminal - State of TexasNicholas LaHood
Nathan Morey
Matthew Daniels
Ross, Dai'vonte E'shaun TitusAppelleeMac Bozza
Trial Court Information
County Court at Law No. 15 
Bexar 
Honorable Robert Behrens 
519657 
Melissa Snell 
 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site