Fourth Court of Appeals

Case: 04-16-00022-CV    
04-16-00022-CV
01/13/2016
Miscellaneous/other civil
Kenneth H. Tarr 
Timberwood Park Owners Association Inc. 
No 
 
 
 
 
 
West Publishing 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
06/03/2016Reply brief filedAppellant
05/31/2016Brief filed - oral argument requestedAppellee
03/15/2016Brief filed - oral argument requestedAppellant
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
07/10/2018Motion for rehearing filed 
06/15/2018Notice received 
06/15/2018Notice received 
05/25/2018Opinion issued 
08/02/2017Notice received 
07/20/2017Case forwarded to higher court 
12/29/2016Petition for review filed in Supreme Court 
12/16/2016Motion for extension of time to file petition for review disposed by Supreme CourtGrant motion
12/16/2016Motion for extension of time to file petition for review filed in Supreme Court 
11/16/2016Motion to strike disposedMotion or Writ Denied
11/16/2016Opinion issuedModified/Reformed and Affirmed
09/20/2016Submitted 
09/19/2016Telephone inquiry to or from the court 
09/19/2016Letter filed 
07/29/2016Set for submission on oral argument 
06/20/2016Order entered 
06/20/2016Motion for extension of time to file response disposedGrant motion
06/20/2016Order entered 
06/17/2016Response filed 
06/09/2016Motion for extension of time to file response filed 
06/03/2016Reply brief filed 
06/03/2016Motion to strike filed 
06/03/2016Letter filed 
06/01/2016Case ready to be set 
05/31/2016Brief filed - oral argument requested 
05/19/2016Supplemental clerks record filed 
05/17/2016Order entered 
05/17/2016Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedGrant motion
05/11/2016Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
04/14/2016Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedGrant motion
04/12/2016Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
03/15/2016Brief filed - oral argument requested 
03/11/2016Record checked out 
03/10/2016Prescreened 
03/09/2016Record checked out 
03/04/2016Clerks record filed 
03/02/2016Order entered 
03/02/2016Motion to abate appeal disposedMotion or Writ Denied
02/24/2016Reporters record filed 
02/23/2016Extension of time to file clerks record disposedGrant motion
02/23/2016Extension of time to file clerks record filed 
02/22/2016No reporters record filed in civil case 
02/22/2016No clerks record filed in civil case 
02/10/2016Motion to abate appeal filed 
01/14/2016Docketing statement filed 
01/13/2016Docketing statement filed 
01/13/2016Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals 
01/13/2016Case began in court of appeals 
01/08/2016Notice of appeal filed in trial court 
12/18/2015Judgment signed by trial court judge 
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
01/13/2016StatusPending action of court
07/10/2018StatusHolding
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Tarr, Kenneth H.AppellantJ. Patrick Sutton
Timberwood Park Owners Association, Inc.AppelleeAmy M. Vanhoose
Mia Lorick
Frank Carroll III
Trial Court Information
County Court at Law No. 3 
Bexar 
Honorable David J. Rodriguez 
2014CV02779 
Kay Counseller 
 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site