Case: 04-12-00610-CV    
Summary judgment
Sundance at Stone Oak Association, Inc. 
Northeast Independant School District, Pape-Dawson Engineers, LLC, and Yantis Corporation 
West Publishing 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
01/10/2013Brief filed - oral argument not requestedAppellee
12/05/2012Brief filed - oral argument requestedAppellant
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
01/22/2014Mandate issued 
11/13/2013Memorandum opinion issuedAffirmed
04/24/2013Letter filed 
03/06/2013Set for submission on briefs - oral argument denied 
01/15/2013Case ready to be set 
01/10/2013Brief filed - oral argument not requested 
12/21/2012Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedGrant motion
12/19/2012Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
12/19/2012Fee paid 
12/18/2012Record checked in 
12/13/2012Record checked out 
12/05/2012Brief filed - oral argument requested 
11/09/2012Reporters record filed 
11/09/2012Clerks record filed 
11/09/2012Motion disposedGrant motion
11/09/2012Order entered 
11/07/2012Supplemental clerks record filed 
11/05/2012Clerks record filed 
10/24/2012Motion filed 
10/23/2012Fee paid 
09/26/2012Docketing statement filed 
09/26/2012Fee paid 
09/26/2012Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals 
09/21/2012Notice of appeal filed in trial court 
09/21/2012Case began in court of appeals 
08/27/2012Judgment signed by trial court judge 
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
01/22/2014Case StoredCase stored
01/22/2020RetentionDate civil case will be destroyed (6 yrs after mandate)
Northeast Independant School DistrictAppelleeRicardo R. Lopez
Charles W. Shipman
Pape-Dawson Engineers, LLCAppelleeCharles W. Shipman
Ricardo R. Lopez
Sundance at Stone Oak Association, Inc.AppellantTom L. Newton, Jr.
Guillermo M. Hernandez III
Vincent Vasquez
Yantis CorporationAppelleeCharles W. Shipman
Ricardo R. Lopez
Trial Court Information
225th Judicial District Court 
Honorable David A. Berchelmann, Jr. 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site