Fourth Court of Appeals

Case: 04-11-00018-CV    
04-11-00018-CV
01/10/2011
Damages
The Edward Aquifer Authority, and Roland Ruiz, in his official capacity as General Manager of the Edwards Aquifer Authority (Appellant/Cross Appellee) 
Glenn and JoLynn Bragg (Appellee/Cross Appellant) 
No 
 
 
 
 
 
West Publishing 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
06/16/2013Amicus curiae brief receivedAppellant
03/27/2013Post submission brief filedAppellant
03/27/2013Amicus curiae brief receivedAppellant
03/13/2013Amicus curiae brief receivedAppellant
03/01/2013Amicus curiae brief receivedAmicus Curiae
09/19/2012Amicus curiae brief received 
09/10/2012Amicus curiae brief received 
08/24/2012Reply brief filedCross-Appellant
08/24/2012Reply brief filedAppellant
07/05/2012Brief filed - oral argument requestedAppellee
07/05/2012Brief filed - oral argument requestedAppellee
05/04/2012Brief filed - oral argument requestedCross-Appellant
05/04/2012Brief filed - oral argument requestedAppellant
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
06/15/2015Mandate issued 
06/12/2015Notice received 
05/01/2015Petition for review disposed by Supreme CourtMotion or Writ Denied
12/02/2014Notice received 
10/16/2014Notice received 
10/15/2014Letter filed 
10/13/2014Case forwarded to higher court 
07/15/2014Notice received 
05/05/2014Petition for review filed in Supreme Court 
04/15/2014Motion for extension of time to file petition for review disposed by Supreme CourtGrant motion
04/14/2014Petition for review filed in Supreme Court 
04/01/2014Notice received 
03/03/2014Petition for review filed in Supreme Court 
01/23/2014Motion for extension of time to file petition for review disposed by Supreme CourtGrant motion
01/22/2014Motion for extension of time to file petition for review filed in Supreme Court 
12/23/2013Motion for extension of time to file petition for review filed in Supreme Court 
12/23/2013Motion for extension of time to file petition for review disposed by Supreme CourtGrant motion
11/18/2013Fee paid 
11/18/2013Letter filed 
11/13/2013Case ready to be set 
11/13/2013Motion for rehearing disposedMotion or Writ Denied
11/13/2013Opinion issuedReversed and Remanded
11/13/2013Submitted 
11/13/2013Set for submission on briefs 
11/13/2013Case reinstated 
11/13/2013Opinion withdrawn 
10/31/2013Letter filed 
10/31/2013Fee paid 
09/30/2013Letter filed 
09/27/2013Fee paid 
09/26/2013Motion for rehearing filed 
09/17/2013Order entered 
09/17/2013Motion for extension of time to file motion for rehearing disposedGrant motion
09/12/2013Fee paid 
09/12/2013Motion for extension of time to file motion for rehearing filed 
08/28/2013Opinion issuedReversed and Remanded
06/16/2013Amicus curiae brief received 
04/29/2013Fee paid 
04/29/2013Letter received 
04/08/2013Fee paid 
03/28/2013Submitted 
03/27/2013Post submission brief filed 
03/27/2013Amicus curiae brief received 
03/18/2013Order entered 
03/13/2013Amicus curiae brief received 
03/01/2013Amicus curiae brief received 
02/28/2013Letter filed 
02/28/2013Fee paid 
01/30/2013Set for submission on oral argument 
09/19/2012Amicus curiae brief received 
09/10/2012Amicus curiae brief received 
08/29/2012Motion disposedMotion or Writ Granted
08/29/2012Order entered 
08/27/2012Fee paid 
08/24/2012Motion filed 
08/24/2012Reply brief filed 
08/24/2012Reply brief filed 
07/23/2012Order entered 
07/23/2012Motion for extension of time to file reply brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
07/12/2012Motion for extension of time to file reply brief filed 
07/12/2012Fee paid 
07/05/2012Case ready to be set 
07/05/2012Brief filed - oral argument requested 
07/05/2012Brief filed - oral argument requested 
06/19/2012Fee paid 
06/01/2012Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
05/31/2012Fee paid 
05/30/2012Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
05/15/2012Internal memo 
05/04/2012Brief filed - oral argument requested 
05/04/2012Brief filed - oral argument requested 
05/03/2012Supplemental reporters record filed 
05/02/2012Supplemental reporters record filed 
04/30/2012Supplemental reporters record filed 
04/02/2012Order entered 
04/02/2012Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
03/29/2012Fee paid 
03/29/2012Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
03/28/2012Motion disposedMotion or Writ Granted
03/28/2012Order entered 
03/09/2012Fee paid 
03/09/2012Motion filed 
02/28/2012Order entered 
02/28/2012Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
02/27/2012Fee paid 
02/24/2012Fee paid 
02/23/2012Supplemental clerks record filed 
02/23/2012Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
01/23/2012Fee paid 
01/23/2012Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
01/23/2012Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
01/20/2012Record checked in 
01/05/2012Record checked out 
01/04/2012Supplemental reporters record filed 
12/30/2011Telephone call received 
12/23/2011Reporters record filed 
12/22/2011Reporters record filed 
12/21/2011Letter issued by the court 
12/15/2011Fee paid 
12/15/2011Fee paid 
12/13/2011Order entered 
12/13/2011Order entered 
12/08/2011Order entered 
12/08/2011Reporters record filed 
12/07/2011Telephone call received 
11/29/2011Order entered 
11/22/2011Letter filed 
10/26/2011Internal memo 
10/20/2011Order entered 
10/14/2011Record checked out 
10/11/2011Supplemental clerks record filed 
09/30/2011Letter filed 
09/13/2011Order entered 
09/13/2011Extension of time to file reporters record disposedMotion or Writ Granted
09/12/2011Extension of time to file reporters record filed 
09/07/2011Order entered 
09/01/2011Extension of time to file reporters record filed 
07/20/2011Order entered 
07/20/2011Extension of time to file reporters record disposedMotion or Writ Granted
07/15/2011Extension of time to file reporters record filed 
06/23/2011Supplemental clerks record filed 
06/13/2011Extension of time to file reporters record disposedMotion or Writ Granted
06/13/2011Order entered 
06/07/2011Extension of time to file reporters record filed 
05/13/2011Record checked in 
05/13/2011Record checked out 
05/11/2011Clerks record filed 
04/19/2011Order entered 
04/19/2011Order entered 
04/19/2011Extension of time to file reporters record disposedMotion or Writ Granted
04/19/2011Extension of time to file clerks record disposedMotion or Writ Granted
04/13/2011Amended notice of appeal filed 
04/11/2011Extension of time to file reporters record filed 
04/11/2011Extension of time to file clerks record filed 
04/11/2011Amended notice of appeal filed 
03/22/2011Docketing statement filed 
03/10/2011Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals 
03/10/2011Fee paid 
03/04/2011Reporters record filed 
01/27/2011Mediation objection filed 
01/26/2011Mediation docketing statement returned 
01/24/2011Mediation docketing statement due 
01/11/2011Fee paid 
01/11/2011Mediation docketing statement returned 
01/10/2011Docketing statement filed 
01/10/2011Notice of appeal filed in trial court 
01/10/2011Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals 
01/10/2011Case began in court of appeals 
12/10/2010Judgment signed by trial court judge 
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
06/15/2015Case StoredCase stored
06/15/2021RetentionDate civil case will be destroyed (6 yrs after mandate)
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
The Edward Aquifer Authority, and Roland Ruiz, in his official capacity as General Manager of the Edwards Aquifer AuthorityAppellantKen Slavin
Mark N. Osborn  
Deborah Clarke Trejo
Glenn and JoLynn BraggAppelleeJ. Ken Nunley
Christian J. Ward
Paul M. Terrill, III
Andreq J. Aelvoet
Ryan Parker Bates
Schuyler Marshall
Trial Court Information
38th Judicial District Court 
Medina 
Honorable Thomas F. Lee 
06-11-18170 
 
 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site