Third Court of Appeals

Case: 03-17-00081-CV    
03-17-00081-CV
01/31/2017
Administrative law
PHI Air Medical, LLC 
Texas Mutual Insurance Company, Hartford Underwriters Insurance Company, TASB Risk Management Fund, Transportation Insurance Company, Truck Insurance Exchange, Twin City Fire Insurance Company, Valley Forge Insurance Company, et al. 
No 
 
 
 
 
 
West Publishing 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
01/18/2018Letter brief filedAppellant
01/02/2018Letter brief filedAppellee
12/21/2017Letter brief filedAppellant
12/21/2017Letter brief filedAppellee
11/30/2017Letter brief received 
11/07/2017Amicus curiae brief received 
10/17/2017Reply brief filedAppellant
10/16/2017Reply brief receivedAppellant
10/09/2017Amicus curiae brief receivedAppellee
09/06/2017Brief filed - oral argument requestedAppellee
09/01/2017Brief filed - oral argument requestedAppellee
06/05/2017Brief filed - oral argument requestedAppellant
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
05/23/2018Petition for review filed in Supreme Court 
04/16/2018Motion for extension of time to file motion for rehearing disposedMotion or Writ Granted
03/19/2018Telephone call received 
03/12/2018Motion for extension of time to file petition for review disposed by Supreme CourtMotion or Writ Granted
03/07/2018Motion for extension of time to file petition for review filed in Supreme Court 
02/15/2018Motion for extension of time to file motion for rehearing disposedMotion or Writ Granted
02/15/2018Motion for extension of time to file motion for rehearing filed 
01/31/2018Opinion issuedReversed and Remanded
01/18/2018Letter brief filed 
01/18/2018Motion for leave disposedMotion or Writ Granted
01/11/2018Motion for leave filed 
01/02/2018Motion for leave disposedMotion or Writ Granted
01/02/2018Letter brief filed 
12/29/2017Motion for leave filed 
12/21/2017Motion for leave disposedMotion or Writ Granted
12/21/2017Letter brief filed 
12/21/2017Letter brief filed 
12/21/2017Motion for leave disposedMotion or Writ Granted
12/19/2017Motion for leave filed 
11/30/2017Letter brief received 
11/30/2017Motion for leave filed 
11/15/2017Submitted 
11/09/2017Letter received 
11/07/2017Amicus curiae brief received 
10/17/2017Reply brief filed 
10/17/2017Motion to exceed brief length disposedMotion or Writ Granted
10/16/2017Reply brief received 
10/16/2017Motion to exceed brief length filed 
10/12/2017Confirmation of oral argument & counsel presenting oral argument 
10/09/2017Confirmation of oral argument & counsel presenting oral argument 
10/09/2017Amicus curiae brief received 
10/06/2017Confirmation of oral argument & counsel presenting oral argument 
10/06/2017Motion for extension of time to file reply brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
10/05/2017Motion for extension of time to file reply brief filed 
09/27/2017Set for submission on oral argument 
09/26/2017Case ready to be set 
09/11/2017Motion for extension of time to file reply brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
09/11/2017Motion for extension of time to file reply brief filed 
09/06/2017Motion to exceed brief length disposedMotion or Writ Granted
09/06/2017Brief filed - oral argument requested 
09/01/2017Brief filed - oral argument requested 
09/01/2017Motion to exceed brief length filed 
08/31/2017Record checked out 
08/01/2017Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
08/01/2017Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
07/31/2017Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
07/28/2017Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
06/27/2017Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
06/26/2017Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
06/19/2017Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
06/16/2017Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
06/05/2017Brief filed - oral argument requested 
06/05/2017Appearance of counsel 
06/02/2017Supplemental clerks record filed 
05/11/2017Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
05/11/2017Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
04/05/2017Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
04/04/2017Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
03/20/2017Reporters record filed 
03/20/2017Record Sent 
03/10/2017Reporters record received not filed 
03/01/2017Clerks record filed 
03/01/2017Supplemental clerks record filed 
02/09/2017Docketing statement filed 
01/31/2017Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals 
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
03/02/2018StatusRelease to publisher
03/07/2018Appeal to Higher CourtHigher court review
03/19/2018StatusMotion for rehearing due
03/20/2017StatusCase sealed
04/12/2018StatusMandate to Issue
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
PHI Air Medical, LLCAppellantMs. Shelby Leigh O'Brien  
Mr. Craig T. Enoch
Ms. Amy L. Saberian
Truck Insurance ExchangeAppelleeMr. James M. Loughlin
Texas Department of Insurance, Division of Workers’ CompensationAppelleeMs. Lisa A. Bennett
Texas Mutual Insurance CompanyAppelleeMr. P. M. Schenkkan
Ms. Mary Barrow Nichols
Mr. Matthew Baumgartner
Mr. Bryan W. Jones
Transportation Insurance CompanyAppelleeMr. James M. Loughlin
Zenith Insurance CompanyAppelleeMr. James M. Loughlin
Valley Forge Insurance CompanyAppelleeMr. James M. Loughlin
Twin City Fire Insurance CompanyAppelleeMr. James M. Loughlin
TASB Risk Management FundAppelleeMr. James M. Loughlin
Trial Court Information
53rd District Court 
Travis 
Honorable Jan Soifer 
D-1-GN-15-004940 
Albert Alvarez 
 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site