Third Court of Appeals

Case: 03-15-00768-CV    
03-15-00768-CV
12/09/2015
Miscellaneous/other civil
Carolyn Barnes 
Austin American Statesman; Austin Legal Blog; Zach Ryall; and KXAN-TV 
No 
 
 
 
 
 
www.txcourts.gov/3rdcoa 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
07/15/2016Brief received - oral argument requestedAppellant
06/09/2016Brief received - oral argument requestedAppellant
05/04/2016Brief received - oral argument requestedAppellant
03/07/2016Brief received - oral argument not requestedAppellant
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
10/13/2016Mandate issuedDismissed for Want of Prosecution
07/28/2016Motion for en banc reconsideration disposedMotion or Writ Denied
07/27/2016Motion to reconsider disposedMotion or Writ Denied
07/26/2016Motion to reconsider filed 
07/26/2016Motion for en banc reconsideration filed 
07/20/2016Motion to abate appeal disposedMotion or Writ Denied
07/20/2016Motion to abate appeal filed 
07/20/2016Motion for extension received 
07/20/2016Motion for rehearing received 
07/15/2016Memorandum opinion issuedDismissed for Want of Prosecution
07/15/2016Motion disposedDismissed as Moot
07/15/2016Motion to exceed brief length disposedMotion or Writ Denied
07/15/2016Motion disposedMotion or Writ Denied
07/15/2016Motion to exceed brief length filed 
07/15/2016Motion filed 
07/15/2016Brief received - oral argument requested 
07/14/2016Submitted 
07/12/2016Motion to recuse disposedMotion or Writ Denied
07/12/2016Motion to recuse filed 
06/13/2016Motion to exceed brief length disposedMotion or Writ Denied
06/13/2016Motion disposedMotion or Writ Denied
06/13/2016Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedDismissed as Moot
06/09/2016Brief received - oral argument requested 
06/09/2016Motion to exceed brief length filed 
06/09/2016Motion filed 
06/09/2016Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
06/09/2016Motion filed 
05/11/2016Motion to exceed brief length disposedMotion or Writ Denied
05/04/2016Brief received - oral argument requested 
05/04/2016Motion to exceed brief length filed 
04/22/2016Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
04/22/2016Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
04/19/2016Notice of late brief 
03/14/2016Letter issued by the court 
03/08/2016Motion disposedMotion or Writ Denied
03/07/2016Brief received - oral argument not requested 
03/07/2016Motion filed 
02/26/2016Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedDismissed as Moot
02/22/2016Supplemental reporters record filed 
02/17/2016Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
02/12/2016Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
02/08/2016Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
02/02/2016Record Sent 
01/08/2016Record Sent 
01/05/2016Docketing statement filed 
01/04/2016Reporters record filed 
12/23/2015Clerks record filed 
12/09/2015Affidavit of indigence for costs of appeal filed in trial court 
12/09/2015Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals 
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
10/13/2016Case StoredCase stored
10/13/2022RetentionDate civil case will be destroyed (6 yrs after mandate)
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Barnes, Carolyn AppellantMs. Carolyn Barnes
Austin American StatesmanAppelleeMr. James A. Hemphill
Austin Legal BlogAppelleeMr. James A. Hemphill
Ryall, ZachAppelleeMr. Henry W. Prejean
Trial Court Information
353rd District Court 
Travis 
Honorable Tim Sulak 
D-1-GN-15-002626 
Rhonda Watson 
 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site