Third Court of Appeals

Case: 03-15-00368-CV    
03-15-00368-CV
06/15/2015
Election contest/appeal - Regular appeal
Laura Pressley 
Gregorio "Greg" Casar 
No 
 
 
 
 
 
www.txcourts.gov/3rdcoa 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
05/20/2016Post submission brief filedAppellee
05/20/2016Post submission brief filedAppellant
05/18/2016Post submission brief receivedAppellee
02/17/2016Reply brief filedAppellant
02/16/2016Reply brief receivedAppellant
01/15/2016Brief filed - oral argument requestedAppellee
01/15/2016Amicus curiae brief receivedAmicus Curiae
09/16/2015Brief filed - oral argument requestedAppellant
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
08/14/2017Motion for extension filed 
04/07/2017Petition for discretionary review filed in Court of Criminal Appeals 
02/28/2017Motion for extension of time to file petition for review disposed by Supreme CourtMotion or Writ Granted
01/23/2017Motion for extension of time to file petition for review disposed by Supreme CourtMotion or Writ Granted
12/23/2016Memorandum opinion issuedAffirmed
10/06/2016Letter received 
05/23/2016Additional copies of documents received after initial filing 
05/20/2016Post submission brief filed 
05/20/2016Motion to file post submission brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
05/20/2016Post submission brief filed 
05/20/2016Motion to file post submission brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
05/18/2016Post submission brief received 
05/18/2016Motion to file post submission brief filed 
05/09/2016Motion to file post submission brief filed 
04/27/2016Submitted 
04/25/2016Confirmation of oral argument & counsel presenting oral argument 
04/11/2016Motion to withdraw attorney disposedMotion or Writ Granted
04/08/2016Motion to withdraw attorney filed 
04/07/2016Motion received 
04/07/2016Appearance of counsel 
04/07/2016Confirmation of oral argument & counsel presenting oral argument 
03/29/2016Confirmation of oral argument & counsel presenting oral argument 
03/25/2016Confirmation of oral argument & counsel presenting oral argument 
03/24/2016Response requested by the court 
03/24/2016Set for submission on oral argument 
02/17/2016Reply brief filed 
02/17/2016Motion for extension of time to file reply brief disposedDismissed as Moot
02/17/2016Motion to exceed brief length disposedMotion or Writ Granted
02/16/2016Reply brief received 
02/16/2016Case ready to be set 
02/12/2016Motion for extension of time to file reply brief filed 
02/10/2016Response filed 
02/09/2016Motion to exceed brief length filed 
01/21/2016Motion for extension of time to file reply brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
01/21/2016Motion for extension of time to file reply brief filed 
01/20/2016Additional copies of documents received after initial filing 
01/19/2016Letter received 
01/15/2016Brief filed - oral argument requested 
01/15/2016Amicus curiae brief received 
12/03/2015Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
12/03/2015Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
12/02/2015Record Sent 
11/09/2015Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
11/09/2015Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
11/04/2015Record Sent 
09/25/2015Motion disposedMotion or Writ Granted
09/24/2015Corrected pages to opinion issued 
09/22/2015Motion filed 
09/18/2015Letter filed 
09/17/2015Order enteredOrdered
09/16/2015Brief filed - oral argument requested 
09/02/2015Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
09/02/2015Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
08/14/2015Supplemental clerks record filed 
08/11/2015Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
08/11/2015Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
08/07/2015Supplemental clerks record filed 
08/06/2015Supplemental clerks record filed 
08/01/2015Exhibits filed 
08/01/2015Supplemental reporters record filed 
07/31/2015Telephone call received 
07/30/2015Amended notice of appeal filed 
07/29/2015Supplemental clerks record filed 
07/21/2015Record Sent 
07/20/2015Clerks notice to court regarding status of record 
07/20/2015Motion for extension received 
07/10/2015Letter received 
07/10/2015Supplemental clerks record due 
07/10/2015Amended notice of appeal filed 
07/09/2015Record Sent 
07/08/2015Reporters record filed 
07/07/2015Letter received 
07/02/2015Clerks record filed 
06/25/2015Clerks notice to court regarding status of record 
06/24/2015Court reporters notice to court regarding status of record 
06/23/2015Appearance of counsel 
06/16/2015Docketing statement filed 
06/15/2015Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals 
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
01/20/2017Appeal to Higher CourtHigher court review
03/06/2017StatusMandate to Issue
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Casar, Gregorio Greg"AppelleeMs. Lisa Bowlin Hobbs
Mr. Kurt H. Kuhn
Ms. Lauren B. Ross
Mr. Jess M. Irwin III
Pressley, LauraAppellantMs. Anna Eby
Trial Court Information
201st District Court 
Travis 
Honorable Daniel H. Mills 
D-1-GN-15-000374 
Nikki Edwards 
 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site