Third Court of Appeals

Case: 03-15-00302-CR    
03-15-00302-CR
05/15/2015
Murder
George Delacruz 
The State of Texas 
No 
 
 
 
 
 
 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
02/15/2017Additional authorities filedAppellant
12/13/2016Brief filed - oral argument requestedState
11/30/2016Brief received - oral argument requestedState
07/26/2016Brief filed - oral argument requestedAppellant
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
07/26/2017Petition for discretionary review disposed by Court of Criminal AppealsMotion or Writ Granted
06/08/2017Response filed 
05/24/2017Record checked out 
05/22/2017Petition for discretionary review filed in Court of Criminal Appeals 
04/21/2017Memorandum opinion issuedModified and, as Modified, Affirmed in part; Reversed and Dismissed in part
04/19/2017Telephone inquiry to or from the court 
04/07/2017Supplemental reporters record filed 
03/08/2017Supplemental reporters record filed 
03/02/2017Submitted 
02/28/2017Response filed 
02/15/2017Additional authorities filed 
02/09/2017Set for submission on briefs 
02/08/2017Oral argument denied 
01/12/2017Case ready to be set 
12/13/2016Brief filed - oral argument requested 
12/13/2016Motion to exceed brief length disposedMotion or Writ Granted
12/13/2016Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
11/30/2016Brief received - oral argument requested 
11/30/2016Motion to exceed brief length filed 
11/28/2016Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
10/26/2016Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
10/26/2016Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
09/26/2016Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
09/26/2016Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
08/25/2016Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
08/25/2016Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
07/26/2016Brief filed - oral argument requested 
07/06/2016Order enteredOrdered
07/06/2016Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
07/05/2016Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
05/19/2016Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
05/19/2016Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
04/04/2016Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
04/04/2016Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
03/04/2016Exhibits filed 
03/04/2016Reporters record filed 
02/29/2016Court reporters notice to court regarding status of record 
02/25/2016Reporters record received not filed 
01/29/2016Order enteredOrdered
11/30/2015Court reporters notice to court regarding status of record 
11/02/2015Court reporters notice to court regarding status of record 
09/21/2015Court reporters notice to court regarding status of record 
08/26/2015Court reporters notice to court regarding status of record 
08/25/2015Notice of late record 
08/19/2015Clerks record filed 
05/19/2015Docketing statement filed 
05/15/2015Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals 
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
05/08/2017StatusMotion for rehearing due
05/08/2017StatusCompliance response due
05/22/2017Appeal to Higher CourtHigher court review
07/03/2017StatusMandate to Issue
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
The State of TexasCriminal - State of TexasMr. M. Scott Taliaferro
The Honorable Margaret M. Moore
The Honorable Stacey M. Soule
Delacruz, GeorgeCriminal - AppellantMs. Linda Icenhauer-Ramirez
Trial Court Information
147th District Court 
Travis 
Honorable Clifford A. Brown 
D-1-DC-13-900252 
Kimberly D. Lee 
Life 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site