Third Court of Appeals

Case: 03-15-00252-CV    
03-15-00252-CV
05/01/2015
Interlocutory
Dr. Behzad Nazari, D.D.S. d/b/a Antoine Dental Center; Dr. Behzad Nazari; Harlingen Family Dentistry, P.C. a/k/a Practical Business Solutions, Series LLC; Juan D. Villarreal D.D.S., Series PLLC d/b/a Harlingen Family Dentistry Group; et al. 
The State of Texas; Xerox Corporation; and Xerox State HealthCare, LLC, f/k/a ACS State HeathCare, LLC 
No 
 
 
 
 
 
West Publishing 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
12/14/2015Supplemental brief filedAppellee
12/14/2015Supplemental brief filedAppellee
12/08/2015Supplemental brief receivedAppellee
09/21/2015Reply brief filedAppellant
08/19/2015Amended brief filedAppellee
08/14/2015Amended brief receivedAppellant
08/10/2015Brief filed - oral argument requestedAppellee
08/10/2015Brief filed - oral argument requestedAppellee
06/19/2015Brief filed - oral argument requestedAppellant
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
09/06/2018Motion for rehearing filed 
08/06/2018Motion for extension of time to file motion for rehearing disposed 
07/06/2018Motion for extension of time to file motion for rehearing disposed 
07/03/2018Motion for extension of time to file motion for rehearing filed 
06/22/2018Opinion issued 
02/22/2017Case forwarded to higher court 
08/29/2016Petition for review filed in Supreme Court 
07/26/2016Motion for extension of time to file petition for review disposed by Supreme CourtMotion or Writ Granted
07/25/2016Motion for extension of time to file petition for review filed in Supreme Court 
06/17/2016Opinion issuedAffirmed in part; Dismissed in part
06/17/2016Case reinstated 
06/17/2016Opinion withdrawn 
06/17/2016Motion for rehearing disposedMotion or Writ Denied
03/28/2016Motion for rehearing filed 
03/10/2016Motion for extension of time to file motion for rehearing disposedMotion or Writ Granted
03/09/2016Motion for extension of time to file motion for rehearing filed 
02/26/2016Opinion issuedAffirmed in part; Dismissed in part
12/16/2015Submitted 
12/14/2015Supplemental brief filed 
12/14/2015Supplemental brief filed 
12/14/2015Motion to file supplemental brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
12/14/2015Motion to file supplemental brief filed 
12/14/2015Motion to file supplemental brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
12/10/2015Confirmation of oral argument & counsel presenting oral argument 
12/08/2015Supplemental brief received 
12/08/2015Motion to file supplemental brief filed 
11/24/2015Confirmation of oral argument & counsel presenting oral argument 
11/20/2015Motion disposedMotion Granted in part
11/12/2015Motion filed 
11/02/2015Confirmation of oral argument & counsel presenting oral argument 
10/30/2015Confirmation of oral argument & counsel presenting oral argument 
10/29/2015Response requested by the court 
10/28/2015Motion to consolidate disposedMotion or Writ Granted
10/28/2015Set for submission on oral argument 
10/14/2015Submission cancelled 
10/14/2015Motion to postpone oral argument disposedMotion or Writ Granted
10/13/2015Letter received 
10/13/2015Motion to consolidate filed 
10/09/2015Motion to postpone oral argument filed 
10/08/2015Corrected entry made by clerks office 
09/21/2015Reply brief filed 
09/09/2015Case ready to be set 
08/28/2015Response requested by the court 
08/28/2015Motion for extension of time to file reply brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
08/28/2015Motion for extension of time to file reply brief filed 
08/19/2015Amended brief filed 
08/19/2015Motion to file amended brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
08/14/2015Amended brief received 
08/14/2015Motion to file amended brief filed 
08/12/2015Letter received 
08/11/2015Supplemental clerks record filed 
08/10/2015Brief filed - oral argument requested 
08/10/2015Brief filed - oral argument requested 
07/08/2015Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
07/07/2015Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
07/07/2015Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedDismissed as Moot
07/07/2015Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
07/06/2015Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
07/06/2015Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
06/29/2015Appearance of counsel 
06/25/2015Record checked out 
06/19/2015Brief filed - oral argument requested 
06/03/2015Appearance of counsel 
06/03/2015Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
06/02/2015Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
06/02/2015Record checked out 
05/27/2015Record checked out 
05/15/2015Clerks record filed 
05/15/2015Clerks notice to court regarding status of record 
05/06/2015Docketing statement filed 
05/01/2015Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals 
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
06/17/2016RetentionCivil case to be retained permanently (archived)
07/25/2016Appeal to Higher CourtHigher court review
08/29/2016StatusMandate to Issue
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Villarreal, JuanAppellantHart Green
Mr. Jason D. Ray
Harlingen Family Dentistry, PC a/k/a Practical Business Solutions, Series LLCAppellantHart Green
Mr. Jason D. Ray
Xerox CorporationAppelleeMs. Constance H. Pfeiffer
Mr. Christopher Cowan
Mr. C. Andrew Weber
Mr. Eric J.R. Nichols
Ms. Gretchen S. Sween
The State of TexasAppelleeMr. John Campbell Barker
Mr. Raymond C. Winter
Mr. Reynolds B. Brissenden
Mr. Philip Andrew Lionberger
Salinas, RockyAppellantHart Green
Mr. Jason D. Ray
Vondrak, JohnAppellantMr. Jason D. Ray
Hart Green
Richard F. Herrscher, DDS, MSD, PCAppellantMr. Jason D. Ray
Hart Green
RGV Smiles By Rocky Salinas, DDS PAAppellantHart Green
Mr. Jason D. Ray
Herrscher, Richard F.AppellantMr. Jason D. Ray
Hart Green
National Orthodontix, MGMT., PLLCAppellantHart Green
Mr. Jason D. Ray
Smith, MichelleAppellantMr. Jason D. Ray
Hart Green
Malone, ScottAppellantHart Green
Mr. Jason D. Ray
Malone, DianeAppellantMr. Jason D. Ray
Hart Green
M&M Orthodontics, PAAppellantMr. Jason D. Ray
Hart Green
Xerox State HealthCare, LLC, f/k/a ACS State HeathCare, LLCAppelleeMs. Gretchen S. Sween
Mr. Eric J.R. Nichols
Mr. Christopher Cowan
Ms. Constance H. Pfeiffer
Mr. C. Andrew Weber
Dr. Behzad Nazari, D.D.S. d/b/a Antoine Dental CenterAppellantHart Green
Mr. Jason D. Ray
Juan D. Villarreal D.D.S., Series PLLC d/b/a/ Harlingen Family Dentistry GroupAppellantMr. Jason D. Ray
Hart Green
Nazari, BehzadAppellantMr. Jason D. Ray
Hart Green
Trial Court Information
53rd District Court 
Travis 
Honorable Stephen Yelenosky 
D-1-GN-14-005380 
Albert Alvarez 
 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site