Third Court of Appeals

Case: 03-14-00402-CR    
03-14-00402-CR
06/19/2014
Murder
Rex Allen Nisbett 
The State of Texas 
No 
 
 
 
 
 
 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
11/10/2015Brief filed - oral argument requestedState
05/08/2015Brief filed - oral argument requestedAppellant
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
08/18/2017Record checked out 
07/26/2017Petition for discretionary review disposed by Court of Criminal AppealsMotion or Writ Granted
03/02/2017Response filed 
02/23/2017Case forwarded to higher court 
02/21/2017Petition for discretionary review filed in Court of Criminal Appeals 
01/18/2017Motion for extension of time to file petition for discretionary review disposed by Court of Criminal AppealsMotion or Writ Granted
12/16/2016Order enteredOrdered
12/16/2016Motion disposedMotion or Writ Granted
12/16/2016Response filed 
12/16/2016Response requested by the court 
12/15/2016Motion filed 
12/15/2016Memorandum opinion issuedReversed and Acquittal Rendered
03/09/2016Submitted 
02/17/2016Confirmation of oral argument & counsel presenting oral argument 
02/16/2016Confirmation of oral argument & counsel presenting oral argument 
02/09/2016Response requested by the court 
02/09/2016Set for submission on oral argument 
12/10/2015Case ready to be set 
11/10/2015Brief filed - oral argument requested 
10/12/2015Order enteredOrdered
10/12/2015Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion Granted in part
10/12/2015Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedDismissed as Moot
10/08/2015Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
08/06/2015Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
06/08/2015Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
06/08/2015Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
05/08/2015Brief filed - oral argument requested 
05/05/2015Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion Granted in part
05/04/2015Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
03/02/2015Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
03/02/2015Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
02/20/2015Record checked out 
02/02/2015Exhibits filed 
02/02/2015Reporters record filed 
12/15/2014Court reporters notice to court regarding status of record 
11/12/2014Court reporters notice to court regarding status of record 
10/09/2014Court reporters notice to court regarding status of record 
07/25/2014Supplemental clerks record filed 
07/09/2014Clerks record filed 
06/19/2014Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals 
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
01/18/2017Appeal to Higher CourtHigher court review
02/17/2017StatusPending action of court
02/24/2017StatusMandate to Issue
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
The State of TexasCriminal - State of TexasThe Honorable Stacey M. Soule
Mr. John C. Prezas
Nisbett, Rex AllenCriminal - AppellantMs. Kristen Jernigan
Trial Court Information
26th District Court 
Williamson 
Honorable Billy Ray Stubblefield 
13-0481-K26 
Ellaine Forester 
42 years 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site