Case: 03-14-00397-CV    
03-14-00397-CV
06/25/2014
Tax
Appellant, American Multi-Cinema, Inc.// Cross-Appellants, Glenn Hegar, Comptroller of Public Accounts of the State of Texas; and Ken Paxton, Attorney General of the State of Texas 
Appellees, Glenn Hegar, Comptroller of Public Accounts of the State of Texas; and Ken Paxton, Attorney General of the State of Texas// Cross-Appellee, American Multi-Cinema, Inc. 
No 
 
 
 
 
 
www.txcourts.gov/3rdcoa 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
12/20/2016Additional authorities filedAppellee
01/21/2015Reply brief filedAppellee
01/15/2015Reply brief filedAppellant
01/15/2015Reply brief filedCross-Appellant
12/18/2014Brief filed - oral argument requestedAppellee
12/17/2014Brief filed - oral argument requestedCross-Appellee
12/17/2014Brief received - oral argument requestedAppellee
10/27/2014Brief filed - oral argument requestedAppellant
10/27/2014Brief filed - oral argument requestedCross-Appellant
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
11/17/2017Notice received 
08/16/2017Petition for review filed in Supreme Court 
07/06/2017Motion for extension of time to file petition for review disposed by Supreme Court 
06/13/2017Motion for extension of time to file petition for review disposed by Supreme CourtMotion or Writ Granted
05/02/2017Motion for rehearing disposedOverruled
03/27/2017Letter filed 
02/08/2017Letter received 
02/06/2017Motion for rehearing filed 
01/19/2017Appearance of counsel 
01/19/2017Motion for extension of time to file motion for rehearing disposedMotion or Writ Granted
01/19/2017Motion for extension of time to file motion for rehearing filed 
01/06/2017Memorandum opinion issuedAffirmed in part; Reversed and Rendered in part on Motion for Rehearing
01/06/2017Case reinstated 
01/06/2017Memorandum opinion withdrawn 
01/06/2017Motion for en banc reconsideration disposedDismissed as Moot
01/06/2017Motion for rehearing disposedMotion or Writ Denied
12/20/2016Additional authorities filed 
07/18/2016Letter received 
05/18/2016Letter received 
01/19/2016Reply to response or motion filed 
12/30/2015Response filed 
11/19/2015Motion for extension of time to file response disposedMotion or Writ Granted
11/18/2015Motion for extension of time to file response filed 
11/17/2015Response requested by the court 
06/05/2015Motion for en banc reconsideration filed 
06/05/2015Motion for rehearing filed 
05/29/2015Motion for extension of time to file motion for rehearing disposedMotion or Writ Granted
05/28/2015Appearance of counsel 
05/28/2015Motion for extension of time to file motion for rehearing filed 
05/11/2015Motion for extension of time to file motion for rehearing disposedMotion or Writ Granted
05/11/2015Motion for extension of time to file motion for rehearing filed 
04/30/2015Memorandum opinion issuedAffirmed in part; Reversed and Rendered in part
03/11/2015Submitted 
03/10/2015Oral argument exhibits filed 
02/11/2015Confirmation of oral argument & counsel presenting oral argument 
02/09/2015Confirmation of oral argument & counsel presenting oral argument 
02/06/2015Set for submission on oral argument 
02/04/2015Notice filed 
01/21/2015Reply brief filed 
01/20/2015Case ready to be set 
01/15/2015Reply brief filed 
01/15/2015Reply brief filed 
01/07/2015Response requested by the court 
12/18/2014Brief filed - oral argument requested 
12/17/2014Brief filed - oral argument requested 
12/17/2014Brief received - oral argument requested 
12/09/2014Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
12/09/2014Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
12/08/2014Motion for extension of time to file reply brief filed 
12/08/2014Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
12/02/2014Supplemental clerks record filed 
11/13/2014Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
11/12/2014Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
11/04/2014Record checked out 
10/30/2014Supplemental clerks record filed 
10/27/2014Brief filed - oral argument requested 
10/27/2014Supplemental clerks record filed 
10/27/2014Brief filed - oral argument requested 
10/10/2014Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
10/09/2014Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
10/08/2014Supplemental clerks record filed 
10/06/2014Record checked out 
09/19/2014Docketing statement filed 
09/17/2014Clerks notice to court regarding status of record 
09/15/2014Record checked out 
09/12/2014Supplemental clerks record due 
09/12/2014Clerks record filed 
08/14/2014Exhibits filed 
08/14/2014Supplemental reporters record filed 
08/14/2014No payment arrangements made with court reporter for record 
08/08/2014Court reporters notice to court regarding status of record 
08/06/2014Court reporters notice to court regarding status of record 
08/06/2014Letter received 
08/06/2014Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals 
07/30/2014Supplemental reporters record filed 
07/29/2014Notice of late record 
07/16/2014Court reporters notice to court regarding status of record 
06/30/2014Reporters record filed 
06/25/2014Docketing statement filed 
06/25/2014Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals 
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
01/06/2017RetentionCivil case to be retained permanently (archived)
06/13/2017Appeal to Higher CourtHigher court review
07/12/2017StatusMandate to Issue
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Glenn Hegar, Comptroller of Public Accounts of the State of TexasAppelleeMr. Jack Hohengarten
Mr. Charles K. Eldred
Ms. Cynthia A. Morales
Ms. Alison Andrews
American Multi-Cinema, Inc.AppellantMs. Olga Goldberg  
Mr. Mark W. Eidman
Mr. Doug Sigel
Ken Paxton, Attorney General of the State of TexasAppelleeMs. Cynthia A. Morales
Mr. Charles K. Eldred
Mr. Jack Hohengarten
Ms. Alison Andrews
Trial Court Information
200th District Court 
Travis 
Honorable Orlinda Naranjo 
D-1-GN-12-003831 
Dora Canizales 
 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site