Third Court of Appeals

Case: 03-14-00257-CV    
03-14-00257-CV
04/24/2014
Administrative law
Maverick County, City of Eagle Pass, Maverick County Hospital District, Maverick County Environmental and Public Health Association, and George Baxter 
Railroad Commission of Texas, Dos Republicas Coal Partnership, Camino Real Fuels, LLC; and North American Coal Company 
No 
 
 
 
 
 
www.txcourts.gov/3rdcoa 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
10/23/2014Reply brief filedAppellant
10/23/2014Reply brief filedAppellant
10/23/2014Reply brief filedAppellant
10/06/2014Brief filed - oral argument requestedAppellee
10/03/2014Brief filed - oral argument requestedAppellee
10/03/2014Brief received - oral argument requestedAppellee
09/03/2014Brief filed - oral argument requestedAppellant
09/02/2014Brief received - oral argument requestedAppellant
08/22/2014Brief filed - oral argument requestedAppellant
08/22/2014Brief filed - oral argument requestedAppellant
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
05/04/2017Exhibits picked up by appropriate attorney of record 
04/27/2017Mandate issuedAffirmed
03/10/2017Petition for review disposed by Supreme CourtMotion or Writ Denied
09/28/2016Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
09/07/2016Case forwarded to higher court 
05/17/2016Motion for extension of time to file response disposed 
04/20/2016Petition for review filed in Supreme Court 
03/14/2016Petition for review filed in Supreme Court 
02/18/2016Motion for extension of time to file petition for review disposed by Supreme CourtMotion or Writ Granted
12/29/2015Memorandum opinion issuedAffirmed
05/20/2015Submitted 
05/19/2015Confirmation of oral argument & counsel presenting oral argument 
04/14/2015Confirmation of oral argument & counsel presenting oral argument 
03/30/2015Confirmation of oral argument & counsel presenting oral argument 
03/30/2015Confirmation of oral argument & counsel presenting oral argument 
03/27/2015Confirmation of oral argument & counsel presenting oral argument 
03/24/2015Set for submission on oral argument 
01/28/2015Letter received 
01/23/2015Confirmation of oral argument & counsel presenting oral argument 
01/23/2015Submission cancelled 
01/21/2015Corrected entry made by clerks office 
01/08/2015Response requested by the court 
01/07/2015Response requested by the court 
11/05/2014Case ready to be set 
10/24/2014Appearance of counsel 
10/23/2014Reply brief filed 
10/23/2014Reply brief filed 
10/23/2014Reply brief filed 
10/06/2014Brief filed - oral argument requested 
10/03/2014Brief received - oral argument requested 
10/03/2014Brief filed - oral argument requested 
09/03/2014Brief filed - oral argument requested 
09/02/2014Brief received - oral argument requested 
08/25/2014Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
08/22/2014Brief filed - oral argument requested 
08/22/2014Brief filed - oral argument requested 
08/22/2014Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
07/25/2014Record checked out 
07/23/2014Exhibits filed 
07/23/2014Supplemental clerks record filed 
07/15/2014Record checked out 
07/10/2014Supplemental clerks record due 
07/07/2014Exhibits filed 
07/07/2014Reporters record filed 
06/18/2014Court reporters notice to court regarding status of record 
05/28/2014Clerks record filed 
05/28/2014Court reporters notice to court regarding status of record 
05/13/2014Clerks notice to court regarding status of record 
05/08/2014Docketing statement filed 
04/24/2014Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals 
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
04/27/2017Case StoredCase stored
04/27/2023RetentionDate civil case will be destroyed (6 yrs after mandate)
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Camino Real Fuels, LLCAppelleeMr. Chesley N. Blevins
Mr. William J. Cobb III
Ms. Jenny Lee Smith
Maverick CountyAppellantMr. David O. Frederick
North American Coal CompanyAppelleeMr. William J. Cobb III
Mr. Chesley N. Blevins
Ms. Jenny Lee Smith
City of Eagle PassAppellantMr. Stephen Ahl
Mr. Heriberto Morales Jr.
Baxter, GeorgeAppellantMr. Javier Riojas
Mr. Thomas M. Weber
Mr. Paul R. Tough
Mr. Adam M. Friedman
Mr. Enrique Valdivia
Maverick County Environmental and Public Health AssociationAppellantMr. Javier Riojas
Mr. Thomas M. Weber
Mr. Paul R. Tough
Mr. Adam M. Friedman
Mr. Enrique Valdivia
Dos Republicas Coal PartnershipAppelleeMr. Chesley N. Blevins
Ms. Jenny Lee Smith
Mr. William J. Cobb III
Maverick County Hospital DistrictAppellantMs. Celeste P. Lira
Railroad Commission of TexasAppelleeMr. Daniel C. Wiseman
Ms. Cynthia Woelk
Ms. Nancy Elizabeth Olinger
Trial Court Information
261st District Court 
Travis 
Honorable Darlene Byrne 
D-1-GV-13-000416 
Meanette J. Salgado 
 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site