Case: 03-13-00753-CV    
03-13-00753-CV
11/13/2013
Miscellaneous/other civil
Glenn Hegar, in his official capacity as Texas Comptroller, and Ken Paxton, in his official capacity as Texas Attorney General 
Texas Small Tobacco Coalition and Global Tobacco, Inc. 
No 
 
 
 
 
 
www.txcourts.gov/3rdcoa 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
12/21/2016Supplemental brief filedAppellant
11/21/2016Supplemental brief filedAppellee
07/18/2014Post submission brief filedAppellee
05/23/2014Reply brief filedAppellee
05/16/2014Amicus curiae brief receivedAmicus Curiae
05/12/2014Amicus curiae brief receivedAmicus Curiae
05/09/2014Brief received - oral argument requestedAmicus Curiae
05/05/2014Reply brief filedAppellant
03/24/2014Brief filed - oral argument not requestedAppellee
02/20/2014Brief filed - oral argument requestedAppellant
02/18/2014Brief received - oral argument not requestedAppellant
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
06/08/2017Document returned 
06/06/2017Mandate issuedReversed and Rendered on Remand
03/27/2017Letter issued by the court 
03/24/2017Memorandum opinion issuedReversed and Rendered on Remand
12/21/2016Supplemental brief filed 
11/21/2016Supplemental brief filed 
10/24/2016Appearance of counsel 
10/20/2016Motion to file supplemental brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
10/19/2016Motion to file supplemental brief filed 
09/23/2016Case remanded from higher court 
09/23/2016Mandate issued 
06/17/2016Motion for rehearing filed 
05/18/2016Motion for extension of time to file motion for rehearing disposedMotion or Writ Granted
04/18/2016Motion for extension of time to file motion for rehearing disposedMotion or Writ Granted
04/01/2016Opinion issued 
10/09/2015Petition for discretionary review disposed by Court of Criminal AppealsMotion or Writ Granted
08/18/2015Motion for extension of time to file reply brief disposed 
07/14/2015Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
03/31/2015Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
03/16/2015Case forwarded to higher court 
12/31/2014Motion for extension of time to file response disposedMotion or Writ Granted
10/30/2014Petition for review filed in Supreme Court 
09/19/2014Motion for extension of time to file petition for review disposed by Supreme CourtMotion or Writ Granted
08/15/2014Opinion issuedAffirmed
08/15/2014Motion disposedDismissed
08/15/2014Motion disposedMotion or Writ Denied
08/15/2014Motion disposedMotion or Writ Denied
07/18/2014Post submission brief filed 
07/16/2014Submitted 
07/16/2014Oral argument exhibits filed 
06/13/2014Set for submission on oral argument 
05/30/2014Motion to expedite filed 
05/23/2014Reply brief filed 
05/22/2014Motion disposedMotion or Writ Granted
05/20/2014Submission cancelled 
05/16/2014Amicus curiae brief received 
05/12/2014Oral argument exhibits filed 
05/12/2014Motion filed 
05/12/2014Response requested by the court 
05/12/2014Amicus curiae brief received 
05/09/2014Brief received - oral argument requested 
05/05/2014Reply brief filed 
04/25/2014Memorandum opinion issuedDissenting Opinion
04/25/2014Order enteredOrdered
04/25/2014Motion disposedMotion or Writ Denied
04/16/2014Corrected entry made by clerks office 
04/16/2014Response requested by the court 
04/15/2014Case ready to be set 
04/11/2014Motion for extension of time to file reply brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
04/11/2014Motion for extension of time to file reply brief filed 
03/25/2014Motion filed 
03/24/2014Supplemental clerks record filed 
03/24/2014Brief filed - oral argument not requested 
03/24/2014Motion received 
03/19/2014Reply to response or motion filed 
03/17/2014Response filed 
03/17/2014Motion for extension of time to file response disposedMotion or Writ Granted
03/13/2014Response received 
03/11/2014Motion for extension of time to file response filed 
03/04/2014Response requested by the court 
02/21/2014Record checked out 
02/20/2014Brief filed - oral argument requested 
02/18/2014Certificate of conference filed 
02/18/2014Motion filed 
02/18/2014Motion filed 
02/18/2014Motion received 
02/18/2014Brief received - oral argument not requested 
02/18/2014Motion received 
01/30/2014Record checked out 
01/27/2014Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
01/23/2014Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
01/09/2014Clerks record filed 
12/19/2013Docketing statement filed 
12/11/2013Court reporters notice to court regarding status of record 
12/10/2013Notice of late record 
12/09/2013Notice of late record 
11/15/2013Amended notice of appeal filed 
11/13/2013Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals 
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
06/06/2017Case StoredCase stored
06/06/2023RetentionDate civil case will be destroyed (6 yrs after mandate)
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Texas Small Tobacco CoalitionAppelleeMs. Shelby Leigh O'Brien  
Ms. Melissa A. Lorber
The Honorable Craig T. Enoch
Ken Paxton, in his official capacity as Texas Attorney GeneralAppellantMr. Joseph D. Hughes
Mr. Arthur C. D'Andrea
Global Tobacco, Inc.AppelleeThe Honorable Craig T. Enoch
Ms. Shelby Leigh O'Brien  
Ms. Melissa A. Lorber
Glenn Hegar, in his official capacity as Texas ComptrollerAppellantMr. Joseph D. Hughes
Trial Court Information
98th District Court 
Travis 
Honorable Stephen Yelenosky 
D-1-GN-13-002414 
Albert Alvarez 
 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site