Third Court of Appeals

Case: 03-13-00747-CR    
03-13-00747-CR
11/06/2013
Assault
Ryan Christopher Wickerham 
The State of Texas 
No 
 
 
 
 
 
 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
12/04/2014Mandate issuedDismissed on Appellant's Motion
09/19/2014Memorandum opinion issuedDismissed on Appellant's Motion
09/19/2014Motion to dismiss disposedMotion or Writ Granted
09/18/2014Submitted 
09/04/2014Motion to dismiss filed 
08/05/2014Order enteredOrdered
07/01/2014Notice of late brief 
05/19/2014Exhibits filed 
05/12/2014Exhibits filed 
05/12/2014Reporters record filed 
05/07/2014Court reporters notice to court regarding status of record 
04/14/2014Record checked out 
04/07/2014Supplemental clerks record filed 
04/04/2014Court reporters notice to court regarding status of record 
03/14/2014Affidavit of indigence for costs of appeal filed in trial court 
03/05/2014No payment arrangements made with court reporter for record 
02/13/2014Telephone call received 
02/12/2014Court reporters notice to court regarding status of record 
12/12/2013Supplemental clerks record filed 
11/27/2013Clerks record filed 
11/19/2013Docketing statement filed 
11/18/2013Telephone call received 
11/06/2013Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals 
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
12/04/2014Case StoredCase stored
12/04/2039RetentionDate criminal case will be destroyed (25 years after mandate)
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Wickerham, Ryan ChristopherCriminal - AppellantMr. Ryan Christopher Wickerham
The State of TexasCriminal - State of TexasThe Honorable Dee Hobbs
The Honorable Lisa C. McMinn
Trial Court Information
County Court at Law No. 1 
Williamson 
Honorable Wilford Flowers 
12-02207-1 
Amber Kirton 
Formal Probation-$412 Court Costs, $2000 Fine 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site