Third Court of Appeals

Case: 03-12-00576-CV
08/31/2012
Libel & slander
Dr. Andrew J. Wakefield, MB, BS 
The British Medical Journal Publishing Group, Ltd.; Brian Deer; and Dr. Fiona Godlee 
No 
 
 
 
 
 
www.3rdcoa.courts.state.tx.us 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
05/29/2014Additional authorities filedAppellant
01/23/2014Post submission brief receivedAppellant
03/25/2013Reply brief filedAppellant
03/04/2013Brief filed - oral argument requestedAppellee
01/04/2013Brief filed - oral argument requestedAppellant
01/04/2013Brief received - oral argument requestedAppellant
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDescriptionDispositionDocument
09/19/2014Opinion issued Affirmed
05/29/2014Additional authorities filedAppellant 
05/29/2014Motion for leave disposedAppellantMotion or Writ Granted
05/16/2014Motion for leave filedAppellant 
05/13/2014Notice of late briefAppellant 
01/23/2014Exhibits receivedAppellant 
01/23/2014Post submission brief receivedAppellant 
05/22/2013SubmittedBoth parties 
05/08/2013Confirmation of oral argument & counsel presenting oral argumentAppellee 
05/06/2013Confirmation of oral argument & counsel presenting oral argumentAppellant 
04/30/2013Set for submission on oral argument  
04/03/2013Response requested by the courtBoth parties 
04/03/2013Case ready to be set  
03/25/2013Reply brief filedAppellant 
03/04/2013Brief filed - oral argument requestedAppellee 
02/28/2013Supplemental clerks record filedDistrict Clerk 
02/28/2013Record checked out  
01/29/2013Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedAppelleeMotion or Writ Granted
01/23/2013Motion for extension of time to file brief filedAppellee 
01/04/2013Brief filed - oral argument requestedAppellant 
01/04/2013Brief received - oral argument requestedAppellant 
12/14/2012Supplemental clerks record filedDistrict Clerk 
11/19/2012Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedAppellantMotion or Writ Granted
11/16/2012Motion for extension of time to file brief filedAppellant 
11/16/2012Supplemental clerks record dueDistrict Clerk 
11/06/2012Email receivedAppellee 
11/05/2012Email received  
10/31/2012Exhibits filedCourt Reporter 
10/31/2012Supplemental reporters record filedCourt Reporter 
10/12/2012Clerks record filedDistrict Clerk 
10/05/2012Clerks notice to court regarding status of recordDistrict Clerk 
10/03/2012Court reporters notice to court regarding status of recordCourt Reporter 
09/28/2012Email receivedCourt Reporter 
09/28/2012Telephone call receivedCourt Reporter 
09/10/2012Document returned  
09/05/2012Reporters record filedCourt Reporter 
08/31/2012Docketing statement filedAppellant 
08/31/2012Notice of appeal filed in court of appealsAppellant 
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
09/18/2014RetentionCivil case to be retained permanently (archived)
10/06/2014StatusMotion for rehearing due
10/20/2014StatusRelease to publisher
12/01/2014StatusMandate to Issue
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
The British Medical Journal Publishing Group, Ltd.AppelleeMr. Marc A. Fuller
Ms. Lisa Bowlin Hobbs
Mr. David P. Blanke
Mr. Thomas S. Leatherbury
Deer, BrianAppelleeMr. Thomas S. Leatherbury
Mr. Marc A. Fuller
Ms. Lisa Bowlin Hobbs
Mr. David P. Blanke
Wakefield, Andrew J.AppellantMr. Brendan K. McBride
Mr. Jay D. Ellwanger
Mr. John D. Saba Jr.
Mr. William M. Parrish
Godlee, FionaAppelleeMr. Marc A. Fuller
Ms. Lisa Bowlin Hobbs
Mr. David P. Blanke
Mr. Thomas S. Leatherbury
Trial Court Information
250th District Court 
Travis 
Honorable Amy Clark Meachum 
D-1-GN-12-000003 
 
 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site