Third Court of Appeals

Case: 03-12-00555-CV
08/23/2012
Administrative law
Texas Commission on Environmental Quality 
Angela Bonser-Lain; Karin Ascott, as next friend on behalf of T. V. H. and A. V. H., minor children; and Brigid Shea, as next friend on behalf of E. B. U., a minor child 
No 
 
 
 
 
 
West Publishing 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
07/19/2013Amicus curiae brief receivedAmicus Curiae
06/12/2013Reply brief filedAppellant
05/10/2013Amicus curiae brief receivedAmicus Curiae
04/22/2013Brief filed - oral argument requestedAppellee
02/19/2013Brief filed - oral argument requestedAppellant
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDescriptionDispositionDocument
10/13/2014Mandate issued Vacated and Rendered
07/23/2014Opinion issued Vacated and Rendered
09/25/2013SubmittedBoth parties 
08/15/2013Confirmation of oral argument & counsel presenting oral argumentAppellee 
08/14/2013Confirmation of oral argument & counsel presenting oral argumentAppellant 
08/05/2013Set for submission on oral argument  
07/19/2013Amicus curiae brief receivedAmicus Curiae 
06/12/2013Reply brief filedAppellant 
05/22/2013Letter receivedAppellee 
05/22/2013Case ready to be set  
05/10/2013Amicus curiae brief receivedAmicus Curiae 
05/06/2013Motion for extension of time to file reply brief disposedAppellantMotion or Writ Granted
05/03/2013Motion for extension of time to file reply brief filedAppellant 
04/29/2013Response requested by the courtBoth parties 
04/22/2013Brief filed - oral argument requestedAppellee 
03/01/2013Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedAppelleeMotion or Writ Granted
02/26/2013Motion for extension of time to file brief filedAppellee 
02/25/2013Motion for extension receivedAppellee 
02/19/2013Brief filed - oral argument requestedAppellant 
02/13/2013Telephone call received  
12/14/2012Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedAppellantMotion or Writ Granted
12/13/2012Motion for extension of time to file brief filedAppellant 
12/05/2012Exhibits filedCourt Reporter 
12/03/2012Reporters record filedCourt Reporter 
12/03/2012Clerks record filedDistrict Clerk 
10/30/2012Notice of late recordDistrict Clerk 
10/15/2012Exhibits receivedCourt Reporter 
10/15/2012Reporters record received not filedCourt Reporter 
09/05/2012Docketing statement filedAppellant 
08/23/2012Notice of appeal filed in court of appealsAppellant 
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
07/23/2014RetentionCivil case to be retained permanently (archived)
10/13/2014Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Bonser-Lain, AngelaAppelleeMr. Adam R. Abrams
Texas Commission on Environmental QualityAppellantMr. Daniel C. Wiseman
Ms. Cynthia Woelk
Brigid Shea, as next friend on behalf of E. B. U., a minor childAppelleeMr. Adam R. Abrams
Karin Ascott, as next friend on behalf of TVH and AVH, minor childrenAppelleeMr. Adam R. Abrams
Trial Court Information
201st District Court 
Travis 
Honorable Gisela D. Triana 
D-1-GN-11-002194 
 
 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site