Third Court of Appeals

Case: 03-12-00511-CV    
03-12-00511-CV
07/30/2012
Tax
Southwest Royalties, Inc. 
Susan Combs, Comptroller of Public Accounts of the State of Texas; and Greg Abbott, Attorney General of the State of Texas 
No 
 
 
 
 
 
West Publishing 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
04/08/2013Reply brief filedAppellant
03/05/2013Brief filed - oral argument requestedAppellee
12/05/2012Brief filed - oral argument requestedAppellant
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
10/21/2016Mandate issued 
09/06/2016Motion for rehearing filed 
07/21/2016Motion for extension of time to file motion for rehearing disposedMotion or Writ Granted
06/22/2016Motion for extension of time to file motion for rehearing disposedMotion or Writ Granted
06/17/2016Opinion issued 
11/17/2015Motion for extension of time to file reply brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
06/25/2015Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
06/24/2015Case forwarded to higher court 
05/01/2015Motion for extension of time to file response disposedMotion or Writ Granted
02/17/2015Motion for extension of time to file response disposedMotion or Writ Granted
12/11/2014Petition for review filed in Supreme Court 
11/25/2014Motion for extension of time to file petition for review disposed by Supreme CourtMotion or Writ Granted
10/16/2014Motion for extension of time to file petition for review disposed by Supreme CourtMotion or Writ Granted
09/19/2014Motion for extension of time to file petition for review disposed by Supreme CourtMotion or Writ Granted
09/18/2014Motion for extension of time to file petition for review filed in Supreme Court 
08/13/2014Memorandum opinion issuedAffirmed
09/25/2013Submitted 
09/24/2013Oral argument exhibits filed 
09/23/2013Record checked out 
08/26/2013Record checked out 
08/12/2013Confirmation of oral argument & counsel presenting oral argument 
08/07/2013Confirmation of oral argument & counsel presenting oral argument 
08/05/2013Set for submission on oral argument 
06/20/2013Response requested by the court 
04/11/2013Record checked out 
04/08/2013Reply brief filed 
04/04/2013Supplemental clerks record filed 
04/04/2013Case ready to be set 
03/19/2013Motion for extension of time to file reply brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
03/18/2013Motion for extension of time to file reply brief filed 
03/05/2013Brief filed - oral argument requested 
01/07/2013Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
01/04/2013Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
12/07/2012Email received 
12/05/2012Brief filed - oral argument requested 
11/05/2012Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
11/01/2012Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
10/30/2012Telephone call received 
10/16/2012Email received 
10/16/2012Email received 
10/01/2012Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
09/27/2012Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
09/07/2012Telephone call received 
08/31/2012Clerks record filed 
08/28/2012Exhibits filed 
08/28/2012Reporters record filed 
08/28/2012Telephone call received 
08/27/2012Reporters record received not filed 
08/27/2012Exhibits received 
07/31/2012Docketing statement filed 
07/30/2012Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals 
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
10/21/2016Case StoredCase stored
10/21/2022RetentionDate civil case will be destroyed (6 yrs after mandate)
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Southwest Royalties, Inc.AppellantMr. Ray Langenberg
Mr. Doug Sigel
Mr. Mark W. Eidman
Mr. David E. Keltner
Susan Combs, Comptroller of Public Accounts of the State of TexasAppelleeMr. Michael P. Murphy
Greg Abbott, Attorney General of the State of TexasAppelleeMr. Michael P. Murphy
Trial Court Information
353rd District Court 
Travis 
Honorable John K. Dietz 
D-1-GN-09-004284 
 
 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site