Third Court of Appeals

Case: 03-12-00255-CV    
03-12-00255-CV
04/25/2012
Summary judgment
King Street Patriots, Catherine Engelbrecht, Bryan Engelbrecht and Diane Josephs 
Texas Democratic Party; Gilberto Hinojosa, Successor to Boyd Richie, in His Capacity as Chairman of the Texas Democratic Party; and John Warren, in His Capacity as Democratic Nominee for Dallas County Clerk 
No 
 
 
 
 
 
West Publishing 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
08/15/2012Reply brief filedAppellant
08/03/2012Amicus curiae brief receivedAmicus Curiae
07/26/2012Brief filed - oral argument requestedAppellee
07/02/2012Brief filed - oral argument requestedAppellant
06/28/2012Brief received - oral argument requestedAppellant
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
08/10/2017Mandate issued 
06/30/2017Opinion issued 
09/15/2015Case forwarded to higher court 
07/01/2015Motion for extension of time to file response disposedMotion or Writ Granted
04/27/2015Petition for review filed in Supreme Court 
03/13/2015Motion for en banc reconsideration disposedOverruled
01/16/2015Motion for en banc reconsideration filed 
12/22/2014Motion for extension of time to file motion for rehearing enbanc disposedMotion or Writ Granted
12/22/2014Motion for extension of time to file motion for rehearing enbanc filed 
12/08/2014Opinion issuedAffirmed on Rehearing
12/08/2014Case reinstated 
12/08/2014Opinion withdrawn 
12/08/2014Motion for en banc reconsideration disposedDismissed as Moot
12/08/2014Motion for rehearing disposedOverruled
11/05/2014Motion for en banc reconsideration filed 
11/05/2014Motion for rehearing filed 
11/05/2014Motion for rehearing received 
10/21/2014Motion for extension of time to file motion for rehearing enbanc disposedMotion or Writ Granted
10/21/2014Motion for extension of time to file motion for rehearing disposedMotion or Writ Granted
10/21/2014Motion for extension of time to file motion for rehearing enbanc filed 
10/21/2014Motion for extension of time to file motion for rehearing filed 
10/08/2014Opinion issuedAffirmed
12/19/2012Submitted 
12/17/2012Confirmation of oral argument & counsel presenting oral argument 
12/17/2012Motion in support of motion to appear pro hac vice disposedMotion or Writ Granted
12/17/2012Motion in support of motion to appear pro hac vice disposedMotion or Writ Granted
12/17/2012Motion to appear pro hac vice disposedMotion or Writ Granted
12/17/2012Motion to appear pro hac vice disposedMotion or Writ Granted
12/14/2012Motion in support of motion to appear pro hac vice filed 
12/14/2012Motion in support of motion to appear pro hac vice filed 
12/14/2012Motion to appear pro hac vice filed 
12/14/2012Motion to appear pro hac vice filed 
12/14/2012Motion received 
12/14/2012Motion received 
12/03/2012Fax received 
11/30/2012Telephone inquiry to or from the court 
11/27/2012Set for submission on oral argument 
08/27/2012Case ready to be set 
08/15/2012Reply brief filed 
08/03/2012Amicus curiae brief received 
08/01/2012Response requested by the court 
07/26/2012Brief filed - oral argument requested 
07/24/2012Letter received 
07/02/2012Brief filed - oral argument requested 
06/28/2012Brief received - oral argument requested 
06/11/2012Original exhibits filed 
06/11/2012Supplemental clerks record filed 
05/29/2012Clerks record filed 
05/23/2012Motion for leave disposedDismissed as Moot
05/23/2012Motion to expedite disposedMotion or Writ Denied
05/18/2012Motion for leave filed 
05/18/2012Response filed 
05/08/2012Motion to expedite filed 
05/03/2012Docketing statement filed 
05/02/2012Letter received 
04/25/2012Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals 
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
08/17/2017Case StoredCase stored
08/17/2017RetentionCivil case to be retained permanently (archived)
12/08/2014RetentionCivil case to be retained permanently (archived)
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
John Warren, in his Capacity as Democratic Nominee for Dallas County Clerk AppelleeMr. Dicky Grigg
Mr. K. Scott Brazil
Mr. Chad Wilson Dunn
Texas Democratic PartyAppelleeMr. Dicky Grigg
Mr. Chad Wilson Dunn
Mr. K. Scott Brazil
King Street PatriotsAppellantMr. Kelly J. Shackelford
Mr. James Bopp Jr.
Mr. Jeffrey C. Mateer
Mr. Michael S. Hull
Ms. Margaret A. Wilson
Mr. Brock C. Akers
Mr. Jonathan Michael Saenz
Mr. Hiram Stanley Sasser III
Mr. Justin Edward Butterfield
Mr. Randy Elf
Boyd L. Richie, in his Capacity as Chairman of the Texas Democratic Party AppelleeMr. K. Scott Brazil
Mr. Dicky Grigg
Mr. Chad Wilson Dunn
Trial Court Information
261st District Court 
Travis 
Honorable John K. Dietz 
D-1-GN-11-002363 
 
 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site