Second Court of Appeals

Case: 02-18-00283-CV    
02-18-00283-CV
09/07/2018
Termination of parental rights or conservatorship - accelerated
In the Interest of J.M. and J.M., Children 
 
No 
 
 
 
 
 
 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
11/05/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requestedAppellee
10/16/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requestedAppellant
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
11/05/2018Set for submission on briefs 
11/05/2018Case ready to be set 
11/05/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requested 
10/16/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requested 
10/03/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
10/02/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
09/20/2018Electronic Reporter/Recorders Record Filed 
09/20/2018Telephone call received 
09/17/2018Docketing statement filed 
09/17/2018Electronic Clerks Record Filed 
09/07/2018Case began in court of appeals 
09/07/2018Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals 
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
11/26/2018SubmissionBriefs
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
M., J.Civil - Ad LitemFelipe O. Calzada
M., J.Civil - Ad LitemFelipe O. Calzada
M., L.AppellantSharon E. Giraud
Texas Department of Family and Protective ServicesAppelleeJoseph W. Spence
Victoria Ford
Trial Court Information
323rd District Court 
Tarrant 
Honorable Timothy A. Menikos 
323-104781-17 
Court Reporter, 323rd District Court 
 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site