Second Court of Appeals

Case: 02-18-00255-CV    
02-18-00255-CV
08/15/2018
Termination of parental rights or conservatorship - accelerated
In the Interest of J.D., a Child 
 
No 
 
 
 
 
 
 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
10/24/2018Brief was not filedAppellee
10/08/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requestedAppellee
09/17/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requestedAppellant
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
11/14/2018Submitted 
10/24/2018Set for submission on briefs 
10/24/2018Case ready to be set 
10/24/2018Brief was not filed 
10/10/2018Notice of late brief 
10/09/2018Telephone inquiry to or from the court 
10/08/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requested 
09/17/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requested 
08/27/2018Electronic Clerks Record Filed 
08/20/2018Docketing statement filed 
08/20/2018Electronic Reporter/Recorders Record Filed 
08/15/2018Case began in court of appeals 
08/15/2018Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals 
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
11/14/2018SubmittedSubmitted on briefs
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
F., C.AppelleeJ. David Joyce
Texas Department of Family and Protective ServicesAppelleeJoseph W. Spence
D., J.Civil - Ad LitemKatherine Allen
D., A.AppellantFrank Adler
Trial Court Information
323rd District Court 
Tarrant 
Honorable Timothy A. Menikos 
323-104748-17 
Court Reporter, 323rd District Court 
 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site