Second Court of Appeals

Case: 02-18-00252-CV    
02-18-00252-CV
08/10/2018
Termination of parental rights or conservatorship - accelerated
In the Interest of R.A., R.G., and J.G., Children 
 
No 
 
 
 
 
 
 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
10/29/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requestedAppellee
10/29/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requestedAppellee
10/08/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requestedAppellant
10/08/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requestedAppellant
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
10/30/2018Set for submission on briefs 
10/30/2018Case ready to be set 
10/29/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requested 
10/29/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requested 
10/08/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requested 
10/08/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requested 
10/04/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
10/04/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
10/02/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
10/01/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
10/01/2018Electronic Supplemental Clerks Record Filed 
09/24/2018Electronic Supplemental Clerks Record Filed 
09/21/2018Telephone call received 
09/21/2018Supplemental clerks record due 
09/19/2018Notice of late brief 
09/10/2018Docketing statement filed 
08/31/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
08/30/2018Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals 
08/30/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
08/29/2018Electronic Supplemental Reporter/Recorders Record Filed 
08/28/2018Docketing statement filed 
08/23/2018Electronic Clerks Record Filed 
08/21/2018Electronic Reporter/Recorders Record Filed 
08/14/2018Letter issued by the court 
08/14/2018Case began in court of appeals 
08/14/2018Order received from trial court 
08/14/2018Letter issued by the court for lack of jurisdiction or defect 
08/10/2018Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals 
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
11/20/2018SubmissionBriefs
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
G., B.AppellantFrank Adler
F., B.AppelleeJ. David Joyce
F., H.AppelleeJ. David Joyce
G., J.Civil - Ad LitemRobin Grounds
A., R.Civil - Ad LitemRobin Grounds
Texas Department of Family and Protective ServicesAppelleeJoseph W. Spence
G., R.Civil - Ad LitemRobin Grounds
G., A.AppellantKatherine Allen
Stacy S. Alford
Trial Court Information
323rd District Court 
Tarrant 
Honorable Timothy A. Menikos 
323-104611-17 
Court Reporter, 323rd District Court 
 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site