Second Court of Appeals

Case: 02-18-00249-CV    
02-18-00249-CV
08/10/2018
Termination of parental rights or conservatorship - accelerated
In the Interest of J.H., a Child 
 
No 
 
 
 
 
 
 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
11/13/2018Reply brief filedAppellant
11/12/2018Electronic reply brief filedAppellant
10/23/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument requestedAppellee
10/03/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requestedAppellant
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
11/15/2018Submitted 
11/13/2018Reply brief filed 
11/13/2018Corrected brief requested 
11/12/2018Electronic reply brief filed 
10/25/2018Set for submission on briefs - oral argument denied 
10/23/2018Case ready to be set 
10/23/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument requested 
10/03/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requested 
09/06/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
09/05/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
08/30/2018Electronic Reporter/Recorders Record Filed 
08/28/2018Electronic Supplemental Clerks Record Filed 
08/21/2018Extension of time to file reporters record disposedMotion or Writ Granted
08/20/2018Electronic Supplemental Clerks Record Filed 
08/20/2018Docketing statement filed 
08/20/2018Extension of time to file reporters record filed 
08/17/2018Electronic Clerks Record Filed 
08/17/2018Docketing statement filed 
08/10/2018Case began in court of appeals 
08/10/2018Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals 
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
11/15/2018SubmittedSubmitted on briefs
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
H., J.Civil - Ad LitemBryan K. Buchanan
H., P.AppellantBrittany Weaver
Texas Department of Family and Protective ServicesAppelleeCatherine Luft
Brendan Hyde
Trial Court Information
393rd District Court 
Denton 
Honorable Douglas M. Robison 
17-2996-393 
Court Reporter, 393rd District Court 
 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site