Second Court of Appeals

Case: 02-18-00243-CV    
02-18-00243-CV
08/03/2018
Termination of parental rights or conservatorship - accelerated
In the Interest of S.P., A.P., A.P., J.P., Children 
 
No 
 
 
 
 
 
 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
11/08/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requestedAppellee
10/02/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requestedAppellant
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
11/08/2018Set for submission on briefs 
11/08/2018Case ready to be set 
11/08/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requested 
10/23/2018Appearance of counsel 
10/22/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
10/22/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
10/02/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requested 
09/21/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
09/21/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
09/05/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
09/04/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
08/17/2018Electronic Clerks Record Filed 
08/16/2018Docketing statement filed 
08/16/2018Appearance of counsel 
08/13/2018Electronic Reporter/Recorders Record Filed 
08/09/2018Extension of time to file clerks record disposedMotion or Writ Granted
08/08/2018Extension of time to file clerks record filed 
08/03/2018Case began in court of appeals 
08/03/2018Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals 
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
11/29/2018SubmissionBriefs
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Texas Department of Family and Protective ServicesAppelleeVersel Diane Rush
Leslie Capace
P., A.Civil - Ad LitemTracey L. Jennings
P., J.Civil - Ad LitemTracey L. Jennings
P., III, A.AppellantJoe B. Steimel
P., S.Civil - Ad LitemTracey L. Jennings
P., A.Civil - Ad LitemTracey L. Jennings
Trial Court Information
97th District Court 
Montague 
Honorable Jack A. McGaughey 
2015-0340M-CV 
Court Reporter, 97th District Court 
 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site