Second Court of Appeals

Case: 02-18-00238-CV    
02-18-00238-CV
07/26/2018
Interlocutory
Baylor All Saints Medical Center d/b/a Baylor Scott & White All Saints Medical Center-Fort Worth 
Wanda Dexter, Individually, and as Representative of the Estate of Marla Jo Vorhies 
No 
 
 
 
 
 
 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
10/05/2018Reply brief filedAppellant
09/17/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requestedAppellee
08/27/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument requestedAppellant
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
10/05/2018Reply brief filed 
10/03/2018Set for submission on oral argument 
09/18/2018Case ready to be set 
09/17/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requested 
08/27/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument requested 
08/06/2018Electronic Clerks Record Filed 
08/03/2018Notification received that no record was taken 
08/02/2018Docketing statement filed 
08/02/2018Fee paid 
07/26/2018Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals 
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
10/30/2018SubmissionOral argument
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Baylor All Saints Medical CenterAppellantDavid K. Speed  
Dexter, WandaAppelleeDarren Wolf  
Trial Court Information
67th District Court 
Tarrant 
Honorable Donald J. Cosby 
067-295239-17 
Court Reporter, 67th District Court 
 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site