Second Court of Appeals

Case: 02-18-00237-CV    
02-18-00237-CV
07/25/2018
Termination of parental rights or conservatorship - accelerated
In the Interest of H.B., a Child 
 
No 
 
 
 
 
 
 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
09/10/2018Anders brief filedAppellant
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
10/08/2018Case ready to be set 
10/08/2018Set for submission on briefs 
10/08/2018Letter filed 
10/01/2018Response was not filed 
09/13/2018Letter issued by the court 
09/12/2018Letter filed 
09/11/2018Letter issued by the court 
09/10/2018Anders brief filed 
08/24/2018Electronic Reporter/Recorders Record Filed 
08/16/2018Extension of time to file reporters record disposedMotion or Writ Granted
08/16/2018Extension of time to file reporters record filed 
08/07/2018Extension of time to file reporters record disposedMotion or Writ Granted
08/06/2018Extension of time to file reporters record filed 
08/03/2018Sealed supplemental clerks record filed 
08/03/2018Electronic Clerks Record Filed 
08/02/2018Letter received 
07/31/2018Docketing statement filed 
07/25/2018Case began in court of appeals 
07/25/2018Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals 
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
10/29/2018SubmissionBriefs
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Texas Department of Family and Protective ServicesAppelleeCatherine Luft
B., Z. AppellantRoger M. Yale
Z. B.
B., H.Civil - Ad LitemHeather M. Fisher
Trial Court Information
158th District Court 
Denton 
Honorable Steve Burgess 
14-09721-431 
Norma Rico, 
 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site