Second Court of Appeals

Case: 02-18-00220-CV    
02-18-00220-CV
07/06/2018
Interlocutory
Dr. Jesse Smith, M.D. 
Crestview Nuv, LLC, on its own behalf and derivately on behalf of Nuvivo Bioscience Solutions, LLC. 
No 
 
 
 
 
 
 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
09/24/2018Reply brief filedAppellant
09/04/2018Sealed brief filed - oral argument requestedAppellee
08/13/2018Sealed brief filed - oral argument requestedAppellant
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
09/24/2018Reply brief filed 
09/17/2018Set for submission on oral argument 
09/05/2018Case ready to be set 
09/04/2018Sealed brief filed - oral argument requested 
09/04/2018Motion to access appellate record dispMotion or Writ Granted
08/27/2018Motion to access appellate record filed 
08/13/2018Sealed brief filed - oral argument requested 
07/23/2018Sealed supplemental clerks record filed 
07/19/2018Letter received 
07/18/2018Additional copies of documents received after initial filing 
07/18/2018Docketing statement filed 
07/16/2018Electronic Clerks Record Filed 
07/13/2018Electronic Reporter/Recorders Record Filed 
07/06/2018Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals 
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
10/30/2018SubmissionOral argument
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Smith, M.D., JesseAppellantEamonn Wiles
Crestview Nuv, LLCAppelleeBryan T. Davis
Trial Court Information
48th District Court 
Tarrant 
Honorable David L. Evans 
048-294454-17 
Court Reporter, 48th District Court 
 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site