Second Court of Appeals

Case: 02-18-00215-CR    
02-18-00215-CR
05/14/2018
Habeas Corpus
Ex parte Michael Ellis 
 
No 
 
 
 
 
 
 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
10/08/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requestedState
09/11/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument requestedAppellant
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
10/10/2018Set for submission on briefs - oral argument denied 
10/09/2018Case ready to be set 
10/08/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requested 
09/21/2018Electronic Supplemental Reporter/Recorders Record Filed 
09/21/2018Motion disposedMotion or Writ Granted
09/11/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
09/11/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument requested 
09/07/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
09/06/2018Letter issued by the court 
09/04/2018Motion filed 
08/29/2018Appearance of counsel 
08/10/2018Electronic Supplemental Reporter/Recorders Record Filed 
08/08/2018Electronic Supplemental Reporter/Recorders Record Filed 
08/08/2018Electronic Supplemental Clerks Record Filed 
08/08/2018Case reinstated 
07/11/2018Order issuedAbated
07/11/2018Motion to abate appeal disposedMotion or Writ Granted
07/02/2018Motion to abate appeal filed 
06/11/2018Response filed 
05/31/2018Electronic Reporter/Recorders Record Filed 
05/30/2018Court reporters notice to court regarding status of record 
05/25/2018Docketing statement filed 
05/22/2018Electronic Clerks Record Filed 
05/14/2018Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals 
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
10/31/2018SubmissionBriefs
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
The State of TexasCriminal - State of TexasJoseph W. Spence
Andrea Jacobs
Ellis, MichaelCriminal - AppellantG. Shane Lewis
Leigh W. Davis
Trial Court Information
213th District Court 
Tarrant 
Honorable Louis E. Sturns 
1497758D 
Court Reporter, 213th District Court 
 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site