Second Court of Appeals

Case: 02-18-00214-CV    
02-18-00214-CV
07/03/2018
Termination of parental rights or conservatorship - accelerated
In the Interest of J.B., J.B., K.B., and K.B., Children 
 
No 
 
 
 
 
 
West Publishing 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
08/27/2018Anders brief filedAppellant
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
10/18/2018Motion to withdraw attorney disposedMotion or Writ Denied
10/18/2018Memorandum opinion issuedAffirmed
10/16/2018Submitted 
09/25/2018Set for submission on briefs 
09/25/2018Response filed 
09/11/2018Letter issued by the court 
09/07/2018Letter received 
08/27/2018Letter filed 
08/27/2018Motion to withdraw attorney filed 
08/27/2018Anders brief filed 
08/22/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
08/22/2018Electronic Supplemental Reporter/Recorders Record Filed 
08/20/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
07/31/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
07/30/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
07/16/2018Docketing statement filed 
07/13/2018Electronic Clerks Record Filed 
07/11/2018Electronic Reporter/Recorders Record Filed 
07/03/2018Case began in court of appeals 
07/03/2018Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals 
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
12/17/2018StatusRelease to publisher
12/27/2018StatusMandate to Issue
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
P., I. AppellantBrian J. Newman
I. P.
B., J.Civil - Ad LitemKatherine Allen
B., J.Civil - Ad LitemKatherine Allen
B., K.Civil - Ad LitemKatherine Allen
B., K.Civil - Ad LitemKatherine Allen
Texas Department of Family and Protective ServicesAppelleeJoseph W. Spence
Trial Court Information
324th District Court 
Tarrant 
Honorable Jerome S. Hennigan 
324-498489-11 
Court Reporter, 324th District Court 
 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site