Second Court of Appeals

Case: 02-18-00206-CV    
02-18-00206-CV
06/22/2018
Termination of parental rights or conservatorship - accelerated
In the Interest of I.L., a Child 
 
No 
 
 
 
 
 
 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
09/28/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument requestedAppellee
08/30/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument requestedAppellant
08/20/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument requestedAppellant
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
10/03/2018Set for submission on briefs - oral argument denied 
10/02/2018Case ready to be set 
09/28/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument requested 
09/11/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
09/10/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
08/30/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument requested 
08/23/2018Corrected brief requested 
08/20/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument requested 
07/30/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
07/30/2018Electronic Supplemental Reporter/Recorders Record Filed 
07/27/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
07/10/2018Electronic Reporter/Recorders Record Filed 
07/09/2018Extension of time to file reporters record disposedMotion or Writ Granted
07/05/2018Extension of time to file reporters record filed 
07/05/2018Docketing statement filed 
07/03/2018Electronic Clerks Record Filed 
06/22/2018Case began in court of appeals 
06/22/2018Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals 
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
10/24/2018SubmissionBriefs
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Texas Department of Family and Protective ServicesAppelleeCatherine Luft
Andrea Simmons
L., D.AppellantAmanda M. Coffey
L., I.Civil - Ad LitemAndrew M. Lloyd
F., J.AppellantCharity K. Borserine
Trial Court Information
393rd District Court 
Denton 
Honorable Douglas M. Robison 
17-4361-393 
Court Reporter, 393rd District Court 
 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site