Second Court of Appeals

Case: 02-18-00192-CV    
02-18-00192-CV
06/05/2018
Termination of parental rights or conservatorship - accelerated
In the Interest of M.M., A.M., and I.P., Children 
 
No 
 
 
 
 
 
West Publishing 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
08/08/2018Brief was not filedAppellee
07/05/2018Anders brief filedAppellant
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
10/12/2018Petition for review disposed by Supreme CourtMotion or Writ Denied
09/28/2018Petition for review filed in Supreme Court 
09/28/2018Case forwarded to higher court 
08/30/2018Motion to withdraw attorney disposedMotion or Writ Denied
08/30/2018Memorandum opinion issuedAffirmed
08/29/2018Letter filed 
08/29/2018Submitted 
08/08/2018Set for submission on briefs 
08/08/2018Case ready to be set 
08/08/2018Brief was not filed 
08/08/2018Response filed 
08/06/2018Telephone call received 
07/27/2018Response was not filed 
07/05/2018Motion to withdraw attorney filed 
07/05/2018Anders brief filed 
06/15/2018Docketing statement filed 
06/15/2018Electronic Clerks Record Filed 
06/14/2018Electronic Reporter/Recorders Record Filed 
06/06/2018Additional copies of documents received after initial filing 
06/05/2018Case began in court of appeals 
06/05/2018Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals 
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
09/28/2018Appeal to Higher CourtHigher court review
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
M., M.Civil - Ad LitemPaul Daly
M., M.Civil - Ad LitemPaul Daly
M., W. AppellantW. M.
Lyndsay A. Newell
P., I.Civil - Ad LitemPaul Daly
Texas Department of Family and Protective ServicesAppelleeJoseph W. Spence
Trial Court Information
322nd District Court 
Tarrant 
Honorable Nancy L. Berger 
322-519321-12 
Court Reporter, 322nd District Court 
 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site