Second Court of Appeals

Case: 02-18-00187-CV    
02-18-00187-CV
05/31/2018
Suit affecting parent child relationship
In the Interest of K.F., R.F., and T.F., Children 
 
No 
 
 
 
 
 
 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
09/25/2018Electronic reply brief filedAppellant
09/05/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument requestedAppellee
08/06/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument requestedAppellant
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
09/25/2018Electronic reply brief filed 
09/17/2018Set for submission on oral argument 
09/11/2018Notice received 
09/07/2018Case ready to be set 
09/05/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument requested 
08/06/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument requested 
07/05/2018Electronic Clerks Record Filed 
07/05/2018Electronic Reporter/Recorders Record Filed 
06/01/2018Docketing statement filed 
05/31/2018Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals 
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
10/30/2018SubmissionOral argument
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
F., R.AppellantJessica Hall Janicek
F., T.AppelleePatrick J. Clabby
Trial Court Information
233rd District Court 
Tarrant 
Honorable William W. Harris 
233-458476-09 
Court Reporter, 233rd District Court 
 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site