Second Court of Appeals

Case: 02-18-00180-CV    
02-18-00180-CV
05/24/2018
Real Property
Jon Hobson 
Darrell Francis and Catherine Francis 
No 
 
 
 
 
 
 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
09/17/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requestedAppellee
07/13/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument requestedAppellant
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
10/04/2018Motion for extension of time to file reply brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
09/28/2018Set for submission on briefs - oral argument denied 
09/27/2018Motion for extension of time to file reply brief filed 
09/18/2018Case ready to be set 
09/17/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requested 
09/12/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
09/12/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
08/07/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
08/06/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
07/19/2018Appearance of counsel 
07/13/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument requested 
06/13/2018Electronic Clerks Record Filed 
06/13/2018Letter filed 
06/12/2018Notice of late filing fee 
05/31/2018Docketing statement filed 
05/24/2018Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals 
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
10/26/2018StatusReply brief due
11/06/2018SubmissionBriefs
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Hobson, JonAppellantRobert Wood
Francis, DarrellAppelleeJohn E. Westhoff
Georganna L. Simpson
Francis, CatherineAppelleeGeorganna L. Simpson
John E. Westhoff
Trial Court Information
415th District Court 
Parker 
Honorable Roy Graham Quisenberry 
CV17-0052 
Court Reporter, 415th District Court, Parker County 
 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site