Second Court of Appeals

Case: 02-18-00178-CV    
02-18-00178-CV
05/22/2018
Special Appearance
EnerQuest Oil & Gas, L.L.C. 
Antero Resources Corporation 
No 
 
 
 
 
 
 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
08/06/2018Reply brief filedAppellant
07/16/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument requestedAppellee
06/25/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument requestedAppellant
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
09/19/2018Set for submission on briefs - oral argument denied 
08/06/2018Reply brief filed 
08/02/2018Set for submission on briefs - oral argument denied 
07/17/2018Case ready to be set 
07/16/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument requested 
06/25/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument requested 
06/04/2018Electronic Clerks Record Filed 
05/31/2018Electronic Reporter/Recorders Record Filed 
05/25/2018Docketing statement filed 
05/24/2018Motion for emergency relief disposedMotion or Writ Denied
05/24/2018Response filed 
05/23/2018Motion for emergency relief filed 
05/22/2018Additional copies of documents received after initial filing 
05/22/2018Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals 
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
10/23/2018SubmissionBriefs
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
EnerQuest Oil & Gas, L.L.C.AppellantJoseph M. Cox
Antero Resources CorporationAppelleePhillip B. Dye Jr.
Jason R. Grill
Jason Michael Powers
Trial Court Information
141st District Court 
Tarrant 
Honorable John P. Chupp 
141-290089-17 
Court Reporter, 141st District Court 
 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site