Second Court of Appeals

Case: 02-18-00175-CR    
02-18-00175-CR
04/20/2018
Poss of a Controlled Substance
Miguel Angel Aguilar 
The State of Texas 
No 
 
 
 
 
 
 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
06/22/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requestedState
06/15/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requestedAppellant
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
10/03/2018Case forwarded to higher court 
10/02/2018Petition for discretionary review filed in Court of Criminal Appeals 
09/18/2018Certification of Compliance that opinion sent to criminal defendant 
08/30/2018Memorandum opinion issuedAffirmed
08/22/2018Submitted 
08/01/2018Set for submission on briefs 
06/22/2018Case ready to be set 
06/22/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requested 
06/15/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requested 
06/11/2018Electronic Clerks Record Filed 
05/23/2018Electronic Reporter/Recorders Record Filed 
05/23/2018Electronic Reporter/Recorders Record Filed 
05/02/2018Docketing statement filed 
04/20/2018Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals 
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
10/02/2018Appeal to Higher CourtHigher court review
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Aguilar, Miguel AngelCriminal - AppellantAbe Factor
The State of TexasCriminal - State of TexasJoseph W. Spence
John E. Meskunas
Trial Court Information
Criminal District Court No. 1 
Tarrant 
Honorable Elizabeth Beach 
1479403D 
Court Reporter, Criminal District Court No. 1 
2 Yrs. State Jail 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site