Second Court of Appeals

Case: 02-18-00173-CV    
02-18-00173-CV
05/16/2018
Termination of parental rights or conservatorship - accelerated
In the Interest of J.B. a/k/a J.D., a Child 
 
No 
 
 
 
 
 
 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
07/20/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requestedAppellee
07/02/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requestedAppellant
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
08/10/2018Submitted 
07/20/2018Set for submission on briefs 
07/20/2018Case ready to be set 
07/20/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requested 
07/02/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requested 
06/11/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
06/08/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
05/23/2018Electronic Reporter/Recorders Record Filed 
05/22/2018Docketing statement filed 
05/21/2018Electronic Clerks Record Filed 
05/16/2018Case began in court of appeals 
05/16/2018Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals 
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
08/10/2018SubmittedSubmitted on briefs
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
B., J.Civil - Ad LitemLacie Friday
D., S.AppellantRichard A. Gladstone
Texas Department of Family and Protective ServicesAppelleeJoseph W. Spence
John E. Meskunas
Trial Court Information
325th District Court 
Tarrant 
Honorable Judith G. Wells 
325-385480-05 
Court Reporter, 325th District Court 
 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site