Second Court of Appeals

Case: 02-18-00171-CV    
02-18-00171-CV
05/16/2018
Special Appearance
Rex Performance Products, LLC 
Manu Bettegowda and Pregis Performance Products, LLC 
No 
 
 
 
 
 
 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
09/04/2018Electronic reply brief filedAppellant
07/23/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requestedAppellee
06/18/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument requestedAppellant
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
09/19/2018Assignment of visiting judge 
09/04/2018Electronic reply brief filed 
08/20/2018Motion for extension of time to file reply brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
08/16/2018Motion for extension of time to file reply brief filed 
08/15/2018Set for submission on briefs - oral argument denied 
08/03/2018Motion for extension of time to file reply brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
08/03/2018Motion for extension of time to file reply brief filed 
07/23/2018Case ready to be set 
07/23/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requested 
07/23/2018Appearance of counsel 
06/26/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
06/25/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
06/18/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument requested 
05/29/2018Electronic Clerks Record Filed 
05/22/2018Electronic Reporter/Recorders Record Filed 
05/17/2018Docketing statement filed 
05/16/2018Additional copies of documents received after initial filing 
05/16/2018Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals 
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
10/23/2018SubmissionBriefs
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Bettegowda, ManuAppelleeMatthew D. Stayton
Lars L. Berg
Pregis Performance Products, LLCAppelleeMatthew D. Stayton
Lars L. Berg
Rex Performance Products, LLCAppellantDarrell W. Cook
Trial Court Information
141st District Court 
Tarrant 
Honorable John P. Chupp 
141-298129-18 
Court Reporter, 141st District Court 
 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site