Second Court of Appeals

Case: 02-18-00161-CV    
02-18-00161-CV
05/10/2018
Special Appearance
International Governor Services LLC 
Scott Douglas Rasmussen, individually and as Personal Representative of the Estate of Peyton Nicole Rasmussen, deceased, and the Estate of Parker Stone Rasmussen, deceased; and Delavae Ann Carlson, individually and as Personal Representative of the Estate of Michael Glenn Mastalez, deceased 
No 
 
 
 
 
 
 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
07/16/2018Electronic reply brief filedAppellant
06/25/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requestedAppellee
06/04/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument requestedAppellant
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
08/02/2018Set for submission on oral argument 
07/16/2018Electronic reply brief filed 
06/25/2018Case ready to be set 
06/25/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requested 
06/05/2018Electronic Supplemental Clerks Record Filed 
06/04/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument requested 
05/21/2018Docketing statement filed 
05/15/2018Electronic Clerks Record Filed 
05/14/2018Electronic Reporter/Recorders Record Filed 
05/10/2018Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals 
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
09/25/2018SubmissionOral argument
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Rasmussen, Scott DouglasAppelleeWilliam O. Angelley
International Governor Services LLCAppellantDonald Colleluori
Carlson, Delavae AnnAppelleeWilliam O. Angelley
Trial Court Information
348th District Court 
Tarrant 
Honorable Michael Wallach 
348-291241-17 
Court Reporter, 348th District Court 
 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site