Second Court of Appeals

Case: 02-18-00160-CR    
02-18-00160-CR
04/13/2018
Poss of a Controlled Substance
Guillermo Rodriguez 
The State of Texas 
No 
8th Court of Appeals 
04/13/2018 
08-17-00095-CR 
 
 
 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
11/06/2017Brief filed - oral argument not requestedState
10/03/2017Brief filed - oral argument requestedAppellant
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
09/04/2018Mandate issuedAffirmed
06/28/2018Memorandum opinion issuedAffirmed
05/21/2018Submitted 
04/16/2018Set for submission on briefs 
04/13/2018Case ready to be set 
04/13/2018Case transferred to this court from another court of appeals 
04/13/2018Case transferred from this court to another court of appeals 
02/22/2018Submitted 
12/08/2017Set for submission on briefs 
11/06/2017Case ready to be set 
11/06/2017Brief filed - oral argument not requested 
10/31/2017Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
10/31/2017Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
10/03/2017Brief filed - oral argument requested 
10/03/2017Motion for leave disposedMotion or Writ Granted
10/03/2017Motion for leave filed 
09/25/2017Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
09/25/2017Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
09/20/2017Notice of late brief 
09/06/2017Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
09/06/2017Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
07/31/2017Reporters record filed 
07/31/2017Reporters record filed 
07/05/2017Clerks record filed 
07/05/2017Extension of time to file reporters record disposedMotion or Writ Granted
07/05/2017Extension of time to file reporters record filed 
04/13/2017Case transferred to this court from another court of appeals 
04/13/2017Case transferred from this court to another court of appealsMotion or Writ Granted
03/23/2017Motion for new trial was filed in the trial court 
03/10/2017Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals 
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
09/04/2018Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Rodriguez, GuillermoCriminal - AppellantJohn W. Stickels
The State of TexasCriminal - State of TexasJoseph W. Spence
Steven Waller Conder
Trial Court Information
432nd District Court 
Tarrant 
Honorable Ruben Gonzalez 
1457902D 
Connie Gilfeather 
30 Yrs. IDTDCJ 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site