Second Court of Appeals

Case: 02-18-00153-CR    
02-18-00153-CR
04/13/2018
Miscellaneous/Other Criminal including Misdemeanor or Felony
Michael Ramirez 
The State of Texas 
No 
8th Court of Appeals 
04/13/2018 
08-17-00084-CR 
 
 
 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
01/12/2018Brief filed - oral argument not requestedState
12/04/2017Brief filed - oral argument requestedAppellant
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
08/14/2018Motion for extension of time to file petition for discretionary review disposed by Court of Criminal AppealsMotion or Writ Granted
07/12/2018Motion for rehearing disposedMotion or Writ Denied
07/02/2018Motion for rehearing filed 
06/04/2018Motion for extension of time to file motion for rehearing disposedMotion or Writ Granted
06/04/2018Motion for extension of time to file motion for rehearing enbanc disposedMotion or Writ Granted
06/01/2018Motion for extension of time to file motion for rehearing filed 
06/01/2018Motion for extension of time to file motion for rehearing enbanc filed 
05/17/2018Memorandum opinion issuedAffirmed
05/07/2018Original exhibits filed 
05/03/2018Order entered 
04/16/2018Set for submission on briefs 
04/13/2018Case ready to be set 
04/13/2018Case transferred to this court from another court of appeals 
04/13/2018Case transferred from this court to another court of appeals 
01/12/2018Case ready to be set 
01/12/2018Brief filed - oral argument not requested 
01/03/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
01/03/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
12/04/2017Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
12/04/2017Brief filed - oral argument requested 
12/04/2017Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
10/30/2017Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
10/30/2017Order entered 
10/27/2017Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
09/26/2017Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
09/26/2017Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
08/30/2017Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
08/29/2017Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
08/25/2017Notice of late brief 
07/21/2017Reporters record filed 
06/21/2017Extension of time to file reporters record disposedMotion or Writ Granted
06/19/2017Extension of time to file reporters record filed 
06/07/2017No payment arrangements made with court reporter for record 
06/06/2017Clerks record filed 
04/13/2017Case transferred to this court from another court of appeals 
04/13/2017Case transferred from this court to another court of appealsMotion or Writ Granted
03/10/2017Motion for new trial was filed in the trial court 
03/06/2017Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals 
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
09/12/2018StatusPetition for discretionary review due in Court of Criminal Appeals
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
The State of TexasCriminal - State of TexasCatherine Luft
Ramirez, MichaelCriminal - AppellantMitchell Ryan Nolte
Trial Court Information
County Criminal Court No. 1 
Denton 
Honorable Jim E. Crouch 
CR-2016-08358-A 
Pamela D. Payne 
18 Months Probation  

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site