Second Court of Appeals

Case: 02-18-00151-CV    
02-18-00151-CV
05/01/2018
Plea to jurisdiction
James H. Watson and Others Similarly Situated 
City of Allen, City of Amarillo, City of Arlington, City of Austin, City of Balch Springs, City of Balcones Heights, City of Bastrop, City of Baytown, City of Bedford, City of Burleson, City of Cedar Hill, City of Conroe, City of Coppell, City of Corpus Christi, City of Dallas, City of Denton, City of Duncanville, City of El Paso, City of Elgin, City of Farmers Branch, City of Fort Worth, City of Frisco, City of Garland, City of Grand Prairie, City of Haltom City, City of Humble, City of Hurst, et al. 
No 
 
 
 
 
 
 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
09/24/2018Electronic reply brief filedAppellant
09/11/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requestedAppellee
09/11/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requestedAppellee
09/11/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requestedAppellee
09/11/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requestedAppellee
09/11/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requestedAppellee
09/11/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requestedAppellee
09/10/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requestedAppellee
09/10/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requestedAppellee
09/10/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requestedAppellee
09/05/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requestedAppellee
09/04/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requestedAppellee
08/29/2018Electronic reply brief filedAppellant
08/27/2018Electronic reply brief filedAppellant
08/10/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument requestedAppellee
08/10/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument requestedAppellee
08/09/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requestedAppellee
08/06/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requestedAppellee
07/20/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requestedAppellee
06/22/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument requestedAppellant
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
10/15/2018Motion filed 
10/15/2018Motion for additional time for oral argument disposedMotion or Writ Granted
10/15/2018Letter received 
10/15/2018Letter received 
10/11/2018Motion for additional time for oral argument filed 
10/11/2018Letter received 
10/10/2018Letter received 
10/04/2018Set for submission on oral argument 
09/24/2018Electronic reply brief filed 
09/12/2018Case ready to be set 
09/11/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requested 
09/11/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requested 
09/11/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requested 
09/11/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requested 
09/11/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requested 
09/11/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requested 
09/10/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requested 
09/10/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requested 
09/10/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requested 
09/05/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requested 
09/04/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requested 
08/29/2018Electronic reply brief filed 
08/27/2018Electronic reply brief filed 
08/10/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument requested 
08/10/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument requested 
08/09/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requested 
08/09/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
08/08/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
08/06/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requested 
07/20/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requested 
07/16/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
07/16/2018Telephone inquiry to or from the court 
07/13/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
07/11/2018Appearance of counsel 
07/06/2018Appearance of counsel 
06/27/2018Electronic Supplemental Clerks Record Filed 
06/26/2018Appearance of counsel 
06/22/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument requested 
06/20/2018Appearance of counsel 
06/15/2018Appearance of counsel 
06/13/2018Motion to dismiss disposedMotion or Writ Granted
06/12/2018Electronic Supplemental Reporter/Recorders Record Filed 
06/11/2018Appearance of counsel 
06/06/2018Appearance of counsel 
06/06/2018Appearance of counsel 
06/04/2018Appearance of counsel 
05/30/2018Motion to dismiss filed 
05/25/2018Appearance of counsel 
05/23/2018Electronic Reporter/Recorders Record Filed 
05/18/2018Appearance of counsel 
05/14/2018Fee paid 
05/14/2018Docketing statement filed 
05/14/2018Court reporters notice to court regarding status of record 
05/14/2018Electronic Clerks Record Filed 
05/11/2018Document Received 
05/11/2018Clerks notice to court regarding status of record 
05/01/2018Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals 
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
10/17/2018MotionMiscellaneous motion
11/06/2018SubmissionOral argument
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
City of HumbleAppelleeScott Bounds
Eric C. Farrar
City of CoppellAppelleeVictoria W. Thomas
City of AustinAppelleeTracy Snelson
Brandon W. Carr
Lynn E. Carter
John S. Langner
Xerox State & Local Solutions, Inc.AppelleeLars L. Berg
Matthew D. Stayton
City of University ParkAppelleeVictoria W. Thomas
City of MagnoliaAppelleeScott Bounds
City of Balcones HeightsAppelleeGeorge A. Staples Jr.
City of DentonAppelleeGeorge A. Staples Jr.
City of Jersey VillageAppelleeEric C. Farrar
Scott Bounds
City of BurlesonAppelleeGeorge A. Staples Jr.
City of Grand PrairieAppelleeGeorge A. Staples Jr.
City of AllenAppelleeVictoria W. Thomas
City of MesquiteAppelleeGeorge A. Staples Jr.
City of Sugar LandAppelleeGeorge A. Staples Jr.
City of HurstAppelleeMatthew Butler
City of ConroeAppelleeEric C. Farrar
Scott Bounds
City of North Richland HillsAppelleeGeorge A. Staples Jr.
State of TexasAppelleeAnne Marie Mackin
Andrew Bray Davis
City of MarshallAppelleeGeorge A. Staples Jr.
City of DallasAppelleeStacy Jordan Rodriguez
City of WataugaAppelleeGeorge A. Staples Jr.
City of TomballAppelleeEric C. Farrar
Scott Bounds
City of Round RockAppelleeGeorge A. Staples Jr.
City of Corpus ChristiAppelleeGeorge A. Staples Jr.
Mark W. DeKoch
Watson, James H.AppellantRussell J. Bowman
City of League CityAppelleeGeorge A. Staples Jr.
Andrew M. Edison
City of Fort WorthAppelleeLaetitia Coleman Brown
City of BastropAppellee 
City of IrvingAppelleeGeorge A. Staples Jr.
City of FriscoAppelleeCharles J. Crawford
Richard Abernathy
City of BedfordAppelleeMatthew Butler
City of RoanokeAppelleeEdwin P. Voss, Jr.
City of BaytownAppelleeGeorge A. Staples Jr.
City of El PasoAppelleeGeorge A. Staples Jr.
City of Cedar HillAppelleeMelinda F. Louque
Darrell G-M Noga
Christopher A. Klement
City of PlanoAppelleeRobert J. Davis
City of Richland HillsAppelleeGeorge A. Staples Jr.
City of Balch SpringsAppelleeGeorge A. Staples Jr.
City of Little ElmAppelleeEdwin P. Voss, Jr.
City of Haltom CityAppelleeGeorge A. Staples Jr.
City of AmarilloAppelleeGeorge A. Staples Jr.
City of LongviewAppelleeGeorge A. Staples Jr.
City of KilleenAppelleeGeorge A. Staples Jr.
City of GarlandAppelleeKurt C. Banowsky
Scott D. Levine
City of RichardsonAppelleeVictoria W. Thomas
American Traffic Solutions, Inc.AppelleeThomas J. Williams
City of Farmers BranchAppelleeVictoria W. Thomas
American Traffic Solutions, LLCAppelleeThomas J. Williams
City of ElginAppelleeGeorge A. Staples Jr.
City of ArlingtonAppelleeRobert H. Fugate
City of HuttoAppelleeGeorge A. Staples Jr.
City of DuncanvilleAppelleeVictoria W. Thomas
Trial Court Information
153rd District Court 
Tarrant 
Honorable Susan H. McCoy 
153-298996-18 
Court Reporter, 153rd District Court 
 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site