Second Court of Appeals

Case: 02-18-00147-CV    
02-18-00147-CV
04/27/2018
Termination of parental rights or conservatorship - accelerated
In the Interest of A.W., a Child 
 
No 
 
 
 
 
 
 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
08/17/2018Electronic reply brief filedAppellant
08/06/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requestedAppellee
06/29/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument requestedAppellant
06/25/2018Amended brief filedAppellant
06/22/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requestedAppellant
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
09/05/2018Submitted 
09/05/2018Waiver 
09/05/2018Letter filed 
09/05/2018Letter filed 
08/17/2018Electronic reply brief filed 
08/09/2018Set for submission on oral argument 
08/07/2018Case ready to be set 
08/06/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requested 
07/23/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
07/19/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
07/17/2018Letter received 
07/16/2018Telephone inquiry to or from the court 
06/29/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument requested 
06/25/2018Amended brief filed 
06/22/2018Corrected brief requested 
06/22/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requested 
06/18/2018Electronic Supplemental Clerks Record Filed 
06/14/2018Appearance of counsel 
06/14/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
06/14/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
06/14/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
06/14/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
06/06/2018Telephone inquiry to or from the court 
06/06/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
06/05/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
06/04/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
06/01/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
05/17/2018Docketing statement filed 
05/16/2018Electronic Reporter/Recorders Record Filed 
05/14/2018Docketing statement filed 
05/09/2018Extension of time to file reporters record disposedMotion or Writ Granted
05/08/2018Electronic Supplemental Clerks Record Filed 
05/07/2018Extension of time to file reporters record filed 
05/04/2018Additional copies of documents received after initial filing 
05/01/2018Electronic Clerks Record Filed 
04/30/2018Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals 
04/27/2018Case began in court of appeals 
04/27/2018Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals 
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
09/05/2018SubmittedSubmitted on oral argument
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
H., L.AppellantJoe B. Steimel
Texas Department of Family and Protective ServicesAppelleeEric Tai
W., M.AppellantCarey Jensen
W., A.Civil - Ad LitemEd W. Lane
Trial Court Information
78th District Court 
Wichita 
Honorable Greg J. King 
12790-JR-B 
Court Reporter, 78th District Court 
 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site