Second Court of Appeals

Case: 02-18-00145-CR    
02-18-00145-CR
04/13/2018
Murder
Savanna McIntare 
The State of Texas 
No 
8th Court of Appeals 
04/13/2018 
08-15-00066-CR 
 
 
 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
08/17/2015Brief filed - oral argument not requestedState
05/18/2015Brief filed - oral argument requestedAppellant
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
04/16/2018Set for submission on briefs 
04/13/2018Case ready to be set 
04/13/2018Case transferred to this court from another court of appeals 
04/13/2018Case transferred from this court to another court of appeals 
10/20/2016Motion to withdraw attorney disposedMotion or Writ Granted
09/13/2016Motion to withdraw attorney filed 
02/25/2016Submitted 
11/20/2015Set for submission on briefs 
08/17/2015Case ready to be set 
08/17/2015Brief filed - oral argument not requested 
07/15/2015Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
07/15/2015Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
06/15/2015Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
06/15/2015Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
05/18/2015Brief filed - oral argument requested 
04/17/2015Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
04/17/2015Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
04/13/2015Appearance of counsel 
03/18/2015Reporters record filed 
03/11/2015No payment arrangements made with court reporter for record 
02/23/2015Case transferred to this court from another court of appeals 
02/19/2015Case transferred from this court to another court of appealsMotion or Writ Granted
02/11/2015Extension of time to file reporters record disposedMotion or Writ Granted
02/10/2015Extension of time to file reporters record filed 
02/03/2015Sealed clerk record filed 
02/03/2015Electronic Clerks Record Filed 
01/26/2015Document filed 
01/23/2015Motion for extension of time to file notice of appeal disposedMotion or Writ Granted
01/21/2015Docketing statement filed 
01/15/2015Motion for extension of time to file notice of appeal filed 
01/15/2015Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals 
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
05/23/2018SubmissionBriefs
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
The State of TexasCriminal - State of TexasHon. Megan Chalifoux
Robert T. Christian
McIntare, SavannaCriminal - AppellantSamuel R. Terry
Trial Court Information
355th District Court 
Hood 
Honorable The Honorable Ralph H. Walton, 
CR12692 
Mike Carlisle 
20 yrs IDTDCJ 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site