Second Court of Appeals

Case: 02-18-00143-CV    
02-18-00143-CV
04/27/2018
Plea to jurisdiction
James H. Watson and Others Similarly Situated 
City of Southlake 
No 
 
 
 
 
 
 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
07/03/2018Electronic reply brief filedAppellant
06/13/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requestedAppellee
05/29/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument requestedAppellant
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
10/15/2018Motion for additional time for oral argument disposedMotion or Writ Granted
10/15/2018Letter received 
10/11/2018Motion for additional time for oral argument filed 
10/04/2018Set for submission on oral argument 
07/03/2018Electronic reply brief filed 
06/13/2018Case ready to be set 
06/13/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requested 
05/31/2018Electronic Supplemental Clerks Record Filed 
05/29/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument requested 
05/09/2018Fee paid 
05/08/2018Docketing statement filed 
05/07/2018Electronic Reporter/Recorders Record Filed 
05/04/2018Electronic Clerks Record Filed 
04/27/2018Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals 
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
11/06/2018SubmissionOral argument
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
City of SouthlakeAppelleeGeorge A. Staples Jr.
Watson, James H.AppellantPaul R. Smith
Scott A. Stewart
Russell J. Bowman
Trial Court Information
153rd District Court 
Tarrant 
Honorable Susan H. McCoy 
153-278080-15 
Court Reporter, 153rd District Court 
 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site