Second Court of Appeals

Case: 02-18-00140-CV    
02-18-00140-CV
04/23/2018
Certification of Juvenile
In the Matter of D.C. 
 
No 
 
 
 
 
 
 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
06/21/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requestedAppellee
06/12/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requestedAppellant
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
07/13/2018Submitted 
06/22/2018Set for submission on briefs 
06/22/2018Case ready to be set 
06/21/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requested 
06/12/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requested 
05/23/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
05/23/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
05/03/2018Electronic Clerks Record Filed 
05/02/2018Docketing statement filed 
05/02/2018Electronic Reporter/Recorders Record Filed 
04/23/2018Case began in court of appeals 
04/23/2018Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals 
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
07/13/2018SubmittedSubmitted on briefs
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
C., D.AppellantFrank Adler
The State of TexasAppelleeJohn E. Meskunas
Joseph W. Spence
Trial Court Information
323rd District Court 
Tarrant 
Honorable Timothy A. Menikos 
323-106239-17 
Court Reporter, 323rd District Court 
 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site